District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0095 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-21  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 7, 2023 
 
  
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to preserve foreclosure protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC 
Homeowner Assistance Fund program before September 30, 2022 and whose application 
remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, and to require 
that notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of the DC Homeowner 
Assistance Fund program before a foreclosure action. 
  
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this   
resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023.”   
 
Sec. 2. (a) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 22, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	674; D.C. 
Official Code § 42-	851.01), is set to expire on February 20, 2023. 
(b) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	693; 69 DCR 
15121), is not projected to become law until March 8, 2023, due to a delay in congressional 
transmittal because of the change of sessions. 
 
(c) A congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law and 
protect homeowners from foreclosures as they continue to await approvals and payments from 	the Department of Housing and Community Development .  
 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 	Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Congressional Review 	Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 should be adopted after a single reading.  
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.