1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 1 | + | |
---|
| 2 | + | MURIELBOWSER |
---|
| 3 | + | MAYOR |
---|
| 4 | + | February28,2023 |
---|
| 5 | + | HonorablePhilMendelson |
---|
| 6 | + | Chairman |
---|
| 7 | + | CounciloftheDistrictofColumbia |
---|
| 8 | + | JohnA.WilsonBuilding |
---|
| 9 | + | 1350PennsylvaniaAvenue,NW,Suite504 |
---|
| 10 | + | Washington,DC20004 |
---|
| 11 | + | DearChairmanMendelson: |
---|
| 12 | + | EnclosedforconsiderationandapprovalbytheCounciloftheDistrictofColumbiaisan |
---|
| 13 | + | emergencybill,the“ModificationstoContractNo.CW87331withCDESystemsApprovaland |
---|
| 14 | + | PaymentAuthorizationEmergencyActof2023,”andtheaccompanyingemergencydeclaration |
---|
| 15 | + | resolution. |
---|
| 16 | + | ThelegislationwillapproveModificationNos.8,9,and10toexerciseoptionyearoneofContract |
---|
| 17 | + | No.CW87331withCDESystemstoprovideapplicationdevelopmentsupportfortheDistrictof |
---|
| 18 | + | ColumbiaAccessSystem,andtoauthorizepaymentforthegoodsandservicesreceivedandtobe |
---|
| 19 | + | receivedunderthemodifications. |
---|
| 20 | + | Ifyouhaveanyquestionsregardingthislegislation,pleasehaveyourstaffcontactMareScott, |
---|
| 21 | + | ChiefOperatingOfficer,OfficeofContractingandProcurement,at(202)724-8759. |
---|
| 22 | + | IlookforwardtotheCouncil’spromptandfavorableactionontheenclosedlegislation. |
---|
| 23 | + | Sincerely, |
---|
| 24 | + | owyser |
---|
| 25 | + | Secorsausen— |
---|
| 26 | + | 11 |
---|
| 27 | + | 12 |
---|
| 28 | + | 13 |
---|
| 29 | + | 14 |
---|
| 30 | + | 15 |
---|
| 31 | + | 16 |
---|
| 32 | + | 17 |
---|
| 33 | + | 18 |
---|
| 34 | + | 19 |
---|
| 35 | + | 20 |
---|
| 36 | + | 21 |
---|
| 37 | + | 22 |
---|
| 38 | + | 23 |
---|
| 39 | + | 24 |
---|
| 40 | + | 25 |
---|
| 41 | + | 26 |
---|
| 42 | + | 27 |
---|
| 43 | + | 28 |
---|
| 44 | + | 29 |
---|
| 45 | + | 30 |
---|
| 46 | + | 31 |
---|
| 47 | + | 32 |
---|
| 48 | + | 33 |
---|
| 49 | + | 34 |
---|
| 50 | + | €hrairmanPhilMendelson |
---|
| 51 | + | attherequestoftheMayor |
---|
| 52 | + | APROPOSEDRESOLUTION |
---|
| 53 | + | INTHECOUNCILOFTHEDISTRICTOFCOLUMBIA. |
---|
| 54 | + | Todeclaretheexistenceofanemergencywithrespecttotheneedtoapprove |
---|
| 55 | + | ModificationNos.8,9,and10toContractNo.CW87331withCDESystemsto |
---|
| 56 | + | provideapplicationdevelopmentsupportfortheDistrictofColumbiaAccess |
---|
| 57 | + | System,andtoauthorizepaymentforthegoodsandservicesreceivedandtobe |
---|
| 58 | + | receivedunderthemodifications. |
---|
| 59 | + | RESOLVED,BYTHECOUNCILOFTHEDISTRICTOFCOLUMBIA,That |
---|
| 60 | + | thisresolutionmaybecitedasthe“ModificationstoContractNo.CW87331withCDE |
---|
| 61 | + | SystemsApprovalandPaymentAuthorizationEmergencyDeclarationResolutionof |
---|
| 62 | + | 2023”. |
---|
| 63 | + | Sec.2.(a)ThereexistsanimmediateneedtoapproveModificationNos.8,9, |
---|
| 64 | + | and10toContractNo.CW87331withCDESystemstoprovideapplicationdevelopment |
---|
| 65 | + | supportfortheDistrictofColumbiaAccessSystem,andtoauthorizepaymentforthe |
---|
| 66 | + | goodsandservicesreceivedandtobereceivedunderthemodifications. |
---|
| 67 | + | (b)ByModificationNo.8,datedNovember28,2022,theOfficeofContracting |
---|
| 68 | + | andProcurement(OCP),onbehalfofDepartmentofHealthCareFinance,partially |
---|
| 69 | + | exercisedoptionyearoneofContractNo.CW87331withCDESystemsfortheperiodof |
---|
| 70 | + | December10,2022,throughFebruary7,2023,inthenot-to-exceedamountof$999,000. |
---|
| 71 | + | |
---|
| 72 | + | 35 |
---|
| 73 | + | 36 |
---|
| 74 | + | 37 |
---|
| 75 | + | 38 |
---|
| 76 | + | 39 |
---|
| 77 | + | 40 |
---|
| 78 | + | 41 |
---|
| 79 | + | 42 |
---|
| 80 | + | 43 |
---|
| 81 | + | 44 |
---|
| 82 | + | 45 |
---|
| 83 | + | 46 |
---|
| 84 | + | 47 |
---|
| 85 | + | 48 |
---|
| 86 | + | 49 |
---|
| 87 | + | 50 |
---|
| 88 | + | SI |
---|
| 89 | + | 52 |
---|
| 90 | + | se |
---|
| 91 | + | (©)ByModificationNo.9,datedFebruary8,2023,OCPexercisedano-cost |
---|
| 92 | + | extensionofthepartialexerciseofoptionyearonethroughMarch9,2023. |
---|
| 93 | + | (d)ModificationNo.10isnownecessarytoexercisetheremainderofoption |
---|
| 94 | + | yearonefortheperiodofMarch10,2023throughDecember9,2023inthenot-to- |
---|
| 95 | + | exceedamountof$5,267,929.20,whichwillincreasethetotalnot-to-exceedamountfor |
---|
| 96 | + | optionyearoneto$6,266,929.20. |
---|
| 97 | + | (e)Undersection451(b)(1)oftheDistrictofColumbiaHomeRuleAct, |
---|
| 98 | + | approvedDecember24,1973(87Stat.803;D.C.OfficialCode§1-204.51(b)(1)), |
---|
| 99 | + | Councilapprovalisnecessarysincethemodificationswillincreasethevalueofthe |
---|
| 100 | + | contracttomorethan$1millionduringa12-monthperiod. |
---|
| 101 | + | ()Approvalisnecessarytoallowthecontinuationofthesevitalservices. |
---|
| 102 | + | Withoutthisapproval,CDESystemscannotbepaidforgoodsandservicesprovidedin |
---|
| 103 | + | excessof$1millionforthecontractperiodbeginningDecember10,2022through |
---|
| 104 | + | December9,2023. |
---|
| 105 | + | Sec.3.TheCounciloftheDistrictofColumbiadeterminesthatthe |
---|
| 106 | + | circumstancesenumeratedinsection2constituteemergencycircumstancesmakingit |
---|
| 107 | + | necessarythattheModificationstoContractNo.CW87331withCDESystemsApproval |
---|
| 108 | + | andPaymentAuthorizationEmergencyActof2023beadoptedafterasinglereading. |
---|
| 109 | + | Sec.4.Thisresolutionshalltakeeffectimmediately. |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | 1 |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-72 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | March 7, 2023 |
---|
14 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos . |
---|
15 | | - | 8, 9, and 10 to Contract No. CW87331 with CDE Systems to provide application |
---|
16 | | - | development support for the District of Columbia Access System, and to authorize |
---|
17 | | - | payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract . |
---|
18 | | - | |
---|
19 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
20 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Modifications to Contract No. CW 87331 with CDE Systems |
---|
21 | | - | Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
22 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos . 8, 9, and 10 to |
---|
23 | | - | Contract No. CW 87331 with CDE Systems to provide application development support for the |
---|
24 | | - | District of Columbia Access System and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract. |
---|
25 | | - | (b) By Modification No. 8, dated November 28, 2022, t he Office of Contracting and |
---|
26 | | - | Procurement (“OCP”), on behalf of the Department of Health Care Finance, partially ex ercised |
---|
27 | | - | option year one for the period December 10 , 2022, through February 7, 202 3, in the not-to- |
---|
28 | | - | exceed amount of $999,000. |
---|
29 | | - | (c) By Modification No. 9, dated February 8, 2023, OCP exercised a no- cost extension of |
---|
30 | | - | the partial exercise of option year one through March 9, 2023. |
---|
31 | | - | (d) Modification No. 10 is now necessary to exercise the remain der of option year one for |
---|
32 | | - | the period March 10, 2023, through December 9 , 2023, with a total not -to-exceed amount of |
---|
33 | | - | $6,266,929.20. |
---|
34 | | - | (e) Council approval is necessary because th ese modifications will increase the value of |
---|
35 | | - | the contract to more than $1 million during a 12- month period. |
---|
36 | | - | (f) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without |
---|
37 | | - | Council approval, CDE Systems cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 |
---|
38 | | - | million for the contract period beginning December 10, 2022, through December 9 , 2023. |
---|
39 | | - | |
---|
40 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
41 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the M odifications to Contract No. CW87331 ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | 2 |
---|
47 | | - | with CDE Systems Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted |
---|
48 | | - | after a single reading. |
---|
49 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|