District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0131 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-72  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
March 7, 2023 
 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos . 
8, 9, and 10 to Contract No. CW87331 with CDE Systems to provide application 
development support for the District of Columbia Access System, and to authorize 
payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract	. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modifications to Contract No. CW 87331 with CDE Systems 
Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos . 8, 9, and 10 to 
Contract No. CW 87331 with CDE Systems to provide application development support for the 
District of Columbia Access System and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract. 
(b) By Modification No. 8, dated November 28, 2022, t	he Office of Contracting and 
Procurement (“OCP”), on behalf of the Department of Health Care Finance, partially ex	ercised 
option year one for the period December 10 , 2022, through February 7, 202 3, in the not-to-
exceed amount of $999,000. 
(c) By Modification No. 9, dated February 8, 2023, OCP exercised a no-	cost extension of 
the partial exercise of option year one through March 9, 2023. 
(d) Modification No. 10 is now necessary to exercise the remain	der of option year one for 
the period March 10, 2023, through December 9	, 2023, with a total not -to-exceed amount of 
$6,266,929.20. 
(e) Council approval is necessary because th	ese modifications will increase the value of 
the contract to more than $1 million during a 12- month period.   
  (f) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.  Without 
Council approval, CDE Systems cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 
million for the contract period beginning December 10, 2022, through December 9	, 2023. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the M	odifications to Contract No. CW87331    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
with CDE Systems Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted 
after a single reading. 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.