Council | 02/02/2024 | Resolution R25-0194, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001221 | ||
Council | 07/28/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0194 | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0265 | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/23/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 06/16/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/16/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0265 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/07/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |