Council | 10/20/2023 | Resolution R25-0288, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013887 | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0288 | ||
Council | 09/28/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/27/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 09/27/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0279 | ||
Council | 09/21/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 08/04/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 08/01/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/23/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0279 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment | ||
Council | 06/14/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |