Council | 11/17/2023 | Resolution R25-0320, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015018 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0320 | ||
Council | 10/24/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 10/23/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0285 | ||
Council | 10/18/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 07/13/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/23/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/23/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0285 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services | ||
Council | 06/15/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |