Council | 10/20/2023 | Resolution R25-0282, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013881 | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0282 | ||
Council | 09/27/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/26/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0292 | ||
Council | 09/25/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 09/11/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 08/25/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 08/22/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0292 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |