District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0302 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/22/2023

                    District of Columbia Housing Authority 
300 ih Street, SW, 10
th 
Floor, Washington, DC 20024 
202-535-1000 
June 22, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004-3003 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Brenda Donald, Executive Director 
Pursuant to D.C. Official Code§ 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration 	by the Council of the 
District 
of Columbia, the Council Contract Summary for the Agreement to Enter into a Long Term 
Subsidy Contract ("AL TSC") between the District 
of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") and 
Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP (the "Owner") and the proposed "Local Rent Supplement 
Program Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-0lA with Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP Approval 
Resolution 
of 2023." DCHA proposes to provide a housing subsidy to the Owner in the amount 	of 
$1,652,352 annually for a multi-year term 	of fifteen (15) years, in support 	of the District's Local Rent 
Supplement Program ("LRSP") to provide affordable housing units at Lisner Senior Apartments 
located at 5455 Western Avenue NW. 
As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the proposed L TSC. In 
order to facilitate a response to any questions concerning this AL TSC, please have your staff contact 
me at (202) 535-1513. 
I look forward to your favorable consideration 
of this proposed ALTSC agreement. 
Brenda Donald 
Executive Director, District 
of Columbia Housing Authority 
Enclosures 
BD/hg 
cc: Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council 
www.dchousing.org  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
33 
34 
35 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
-~~ 
-thairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of District of 
Columbia Housing Authority 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 	15 years in support of the 
District's Local 
Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with affordable 
housing units for Contract 
No. 2022-ALRSP-0lA with Lisner Senior Independent 	Owner LP for 
program units at Lisner Senior Apartments located at 5455 
Western Avenue, NW. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution 
may be cited as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract 	No. 2022-ALRSP-0 lA 
with Lisner Senior Independent 	Owner LP Approval Resolution of 2023". 
Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title 
II of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support 
Act of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income 
households in the District. 
The passage of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program 
("LRSP"), a program designed to provide affordable housing and supportive services to 
extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless 
or in need of 
supportive services, such as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based, 
tenant-based, and sponsored-
based LRSP affordable housing units. The 	BSA provided for the 
District 
of Columbia Housing Authority ("	DCHA") to administer the LRSP on behalf of the 
District. 
{0030893 
-} 1  1 (b) In September of 2021, the District of Columbia's Department of Housing and Community 
2 Development ("DHCD") issued a Request for Proposals ("RFP") regarding the availability 
of 
3 funds from multiple district agencies, including DCHA, DHCD, the Department 	of Behavioral 
4 Health, the Department 
of Human Services, and the District 	of Columbia Housing Finance 
5 Agency. 
Of the total proposals received, thirty-four developers were chosen 	to work with DCHA 
6 and others to develop affordable housing and permanent supportive housing units for extremely 
7 low income families making zero to thirty percent (30%) 
of the area's median income, as well 	as 
8 the chronically homeless and individuals with mental or physical disabilities throughout 
9 Washington, DC. 
10 ( c) There exists an immediate need to approve the long term subsidy contract with Lisner Senior 
11 Independent Owner LP under the LRSP in order to provide long-term affordable housing units 
12 for extremely low-income households for units located at 5445 Western Avenue 	NW. 
13 ( d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an AL TSC between the District 	of 
14 Columbia Housing Authority and Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP with respect 	to the 
15 payment of a rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Lisner Senior 
16 Apartments and house extremely low-income households with incomes at 30% or less 	of the area 
17 median income. 
18 Sec. 3. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
19 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official 	Code§ 1-204.51), and section 202 	of the 
20 Procurement Practices Reform 
Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
21 Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with Lisner Senior Independent 
22 Owner LP to provide an operating subsidy in support fifty-two (52) affordable housing units 
23 in an initial amount not to exceed $1,652,352 annually. 
{ 0030893 -} 2  1 Sec. 4. Transmittal. 
2 The Council shall transmit a copy 
of this resolution, upon its adoption, 	to the District of 
3 Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor. 
4 Sec. 
5. Fiscal impact statement. 
5 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement 
of the Chief Financial Officer 	as the 
6 fiscal impact statement required 
by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act 	of 1975, 
7 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official 
Code§ 1-301.47a). 
8 Sec. 
6. Effective date. 
9 This resolution shall take effect immediately. 
{0030893 -}3