District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0302 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-1
7-
8-A RESOLUTION
9-
10-25-216
11-
1+District of Columbia Housing Authority
2+300 ih Street, SW, 10
3+th
4+Floor, Washington, DC 20024
5+202-535-1000
6+June 22, 2023
7+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
8+Chairman
9+Council
10+of the District of Columbia
11+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504
12+Washington, DC 20004-3003
13+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
14+Brenda Donald, Executive Director
15+Pursuant to D.C. Official Code§ 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration by the Council of the
16+District
17+of Columbia, the Council Contract Summary for the Agreement to Enter into a Long Term
18+Subsidy Contract ("AL TSC") between the District
19+of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") and
20+Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP (the "Owner") and the proposed "Local Rent Supplement
21+Program Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-0lA with Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP Approval
22+Resolution
23+of 2023." DCHA proposes to provide a housing subsidy to the Owner in the amount of
24+$1,652,352 annually for a multi-year term of fifteen (15) years, in support of the District's Local Rent
25+Supplement Program ("LRSP") to provide affordable housing units at Lisner Senior Apartments
26+located at 5455 Western Avenue NW.
27+As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the proposed L TSC. In
28+order to facilitate a response to any questions concerning this AL TSC, please have your staff contact
29+me at (202) 535-1513.
30+I look forward to your favorable consideration
31+of this proposed ALTSC agreement.
32+Brenda Donald
33+Executive Director, District
34+of Columbia Housing Authority
35+Enclosures
36+BD/hg
37+cc: Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council
38+www.dchousing.org 1
39+2
40+3
41+4
42+5
43+6
44+7
45+8
46+9
47+10
48+11
49+12
50+13
51+14
52+15
53+16
54+17
55+18
56+19
57+20
58+21
59+22
60+23
61+24
62+25
63+26
64+27
65+28
66+29
67+30
68+31
69+32
70+33
71+34
72+35
73+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
74+-~~
75+-thairman Phil Mendelson
76+at the request
77+of District of
78+Columbia Housing Authority
1279 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-July 11, 2023
15-
16-
1780 To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the
18-District’s Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with
19-affordable housing units for Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-01A with Lisner Senior
20-Independent Owner LP for program units at Lisner Senior Apartments located at 5455
81+District's Local
82+Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with affordable
83+housing units for Contract
84+No. 2022-ALRSP-0lA with Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP for
85+program units at Lisner Senior Apartments located at 5455
2186 Western Avenue, NW.
22-
2387 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
24-resolution may be cited as the “Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-01A
25-with Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP Approval Resolution of 2023”.
26-
27-Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
28-December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and section 202 of the
29-Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C.
30-Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-01A, a long-
31-term subsidy contract, with Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP to provide an operating
32-subsidy in support of 52 affordable housing units in an initial amount not to exceed
33-$1,652,352 annually.
34-
35- Sec. 3. Transmittal.
36- The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of
37-Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.
38-
39- Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.
40-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the
41-fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
42-approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
43-
44-Sec. 5. Effective date.
45-This resolution shall take effect immediately.
88+resolution
89+may be cited as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-0 lA
90+with Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP Approval Resolution of 2023".
91+Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title
92+II of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support
93+Act of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income
94+households in the District.
95+The passage of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program
96+("LRSP"), a program designed to provide affordable housing and supportive services to
97+extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless
98+or in need of
99+supportive services, such as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based,
100+tenant-based, and sponsored-
101+based LRSP affordable housing units. The BSA provided for the
102+District
103+of Columbia Housing Authority (" DCHA") to administer the LRSP on behalf of the
104+District.
105+{0030893
106+-} 1 1 (b) In September of 2021, the District of Columbia's Department of Housing and Community
107+2 Development ("DHCD") issued a Request for Proposals ("RFP") regarding the availability
108+of
109+3 funds from multiple district agencies, including DCHA, DHCD, the Department of Behavioral
110+4 Health, the Department
111+of Human Services, and the District of Columbia Housing Finance
112+5 Agency.
113+Of the total proposals received, thirty-four developers were chosen to work with DCHA
114+6 and others to develop affordable housing and permanent supportive housing units for extremely
115+7 low income families making zero to thirty percent (30%)
116+of the area's median income, as well as
117+8 the chronically homeless and individuals with mental or physical disabilities throughout
118+9 Washington, DC.
119+10 ( c) There exists an immediate need to approve the long term subsidy contract with Lisner Senior
120+11 Independent Owner LP under the LRSP in order to provide long-term affordable housing units
121+12 for extremely low-income households for units located at 5445 Western Avenue NW.
122+13 ( d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an AL TSC between the District of
123+14 Columbia Housing Authority and Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP with respect to the
124+15 payment of a rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Lisner Senior
125+16 Apartments and house extremely low-income households with incomes at 30% or less of the area
126+17 median income.
127+18 Sec. 3. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
128+19 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code§ 1-204.51), and section 202 of the
129+20 Procurement Practices Reform
130+Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C.
131+21 Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with Lisner Senior Independent
132+22 Owner LP to provide an operating subsidy in support fifty-two (52) affordable housing units
133+23 in an initial amount not to exceed $1,652,352 annually.
134+{ 0030893 -} 2 1 Sec. 4. Transmittal.
135+2 The Council shall transmit a copy
136+of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of
137+3 Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.
138+4 Sec.
139+5. Fiscal impact statement.
140+5 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement
141+of the Chief Financial Officer as the
142+6 fiscal impact statement required
143+by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
144+7 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official
145+Code§ 1-301.47a).
146+8 Sec.
147+6. Effective date.
148+9 This resolution shall take effect immediately.
149+{0030893 -}3