District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0302 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/11/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-216  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 11, 2023 
 
 
To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the 
District’s Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with 
affordable housing units for Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-01A with Lisner Senior 
Independent Owner LP for program units at Lisner Senior Apartments located at 5455 
Western Avenue, NW.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-01A 
with Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP Approval Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and section 202 of the 
Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-01A, a long-
term subsidy contract, with Lisner Senior Independent Owner LP to provide an operating 
subsidy in support of 52 affordable housing units in an initial amount not to exceed 
$1,652,352 annually.  
 
 Sec. 3. Transmittal.  
 The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of 
Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.  
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief  Financial Officer as the 
fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  
This resolution shall take effect immediately.