District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0309 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/27/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
June 27, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W., Suite 504 
Washington, D.C. 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and approval 
by the Council of the District of Columbia is a proposed 
emergency resolution, the 
"Multiyear Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 
with RATP 
Dev USA, Inc. Emergency Approval Resolution 	of 2023," and an accompanying 
emergency declaration resolution. 
The legislation will approve multiyear Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 
with RATP 
Dev USA, Inc. in the not-to-exceed amount 	of $159,995,322, to operate, manage, and 
maintain several fixed-route service bus routes and designated supplemental special Circulator 
service routes for the Department 
of Transportation. The term 	of this contract modification is five 
years. 
As always, 
my administration is available to discuss any questions 	you may have regarding this 
contract. 
To facilitate a response to any questions, please have your 	staff contact Marc Scott, Chief 
Operating Officer, Office of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759. 
I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action 
on the enclosed legislation. 
Enclosures  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
~ 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve multi year 
Modification No. 12 to Contract 
No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RA TP Dev USA, Inc. to 
operate, manage, and maintain several fixed-route service 
bus routes and designated 
supplemental special Circulator service routes for the Department 
of Transportation. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the "Multiyear Modification 
No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-
0052 with 
RA TP Dev USA, Inc. Emergency Declaration Resolution 	of 2023". 
Sec. 2. (a) 
There exists an immediate need to approve multiyear Modification 	No. 12 to 
Contract No. 
DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. to operate, manage, and maintain 
several fixed-route service bus routes and designated supplemental special Circulator service 
routes for the District Department 
of Transportation. 
(b) 
The Office of Contracting and Procurement, on 	behalf of the Department of 
Transportation, proposes to enter into Modification No. 12 for the period October 1, 2023 
through September 30, 2028 in the not-to-exceed amount 
of $159,995,322. 
1  32 ( c) Council approval is necessary for multi year contracts under section 451 ( c )(3) 	of the 
33 District 
of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official 
34 
Code§ l-204.51(c)(3). 
35 (d) Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the District to receive the 
36 benefit 
of these services in a timely manner from 	RA TP Dev USA, Inc. 
37 (e) These critical services 
can only be obtained through an award 	of the multi year 
38 modification with 
RA TP Dev USA, Inc. 
39 Sec 3. The Council 
of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
40 enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 
41 Multiyear Modification No. 	12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. 
42 Emergency Approval Resolution 
of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
43 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 
2