District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0309 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/11/2023

                             ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-207  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 11, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve multiyear 
Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. to 
operate, manage, and maintain several fixed-route service bus routes and designated 
supplemental special Circulator service routes for the Department of Transportation, and 
to authorize payment for the goods and services to be received under the modification. 
 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Multiyear Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-
0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. (a)  There exists an immediate need to approve multiyear Modification No. 12 to 
Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. to operate, manage, and maintain 
several fixed-route service bus routes and designated supplemental special Circulator service 
routes for the District Department of Transportation. 
(b) The Office of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf of the Department of 
Transportation, proposes to enter into Modification No. 12 for the period October 1, 2023 
through September 30, 2028, in the not-to-exceed amount of $159,995,322. 
 (c) Council approval is necessary for multiyear contracts under section 451(c)(3) of the 
District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official 
Code § 1-204.51(c)(3)).  
 (d) Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the District to receive the 
benefit of these services in a timely manner from RATP Dev USA, Inc. 
(e) These critical services can only be obtained through an award of the multiyear 
modification with RATP Dev USA, Inc. 
 
 Sec 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Multiyear Modification No. 12 to 
Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. Emergency Approval Resolution 
of 2023 be adopted on an emergency basis. 
   ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.