District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0309 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-
7-
8-A RESOLUTION
9-
10-25-207
11-
1+MURIEL BOWSER
2+MAYOR
3+June 27, 2023
4+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
5+Chairman
6+Council
7+of the District of Columbia
8+John A. Wilson Building
9+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W., Suite 504
10+Washington, D.C. 20004
11+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
12+Enclosed for consideration and approval
13+by the Council of the District of Columbia is a proposed
14+emergency resolution, the
15+"Multiyear Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052
16+with RATP
17+Dev USA, Inc. Emergency Approval Resolution of 2023," and an accompanying
18+emergency declaration resolution.
19+The legislation will approve multiyear Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052
20+with RATP
21+Dev USA, Inc. in the not-to-exceed amount of $159,995,322, to operate, manage, and
22+maintain several fixed-route service bus routes and designated supplemental special Circulator
23+service routes for the Department
24+of Transportation. The term of this contract modification is five
25+years.
26+As always,
27+my administration is available to discuss any questions you may have regarding this
28+contract.
29+To facilitate a response to any questions, please have your staff contact Marc Scott, Chief
30+Operating Officer, Office of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759.
31+I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action
32+on the enclosed legislation.
33+Enclosures 1
34+2
35+3
36+4
37+5
38+6
39+7
40+8
41+9
42+10
43+11
44+12
45+13
46+14
47+15
48+16
49+17
50+18
51+19
52+20
53+21
54+22
55+23
56+24
57+25
58+26
59+27
60+28
61+29
62+30
63+31
64+~
65+Chairman Phil Mendelson
66+at the request
67+of the Mayor
68+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
1269 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-July 11, 2023
15-
16-
1770 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve multi year
18-Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. to
19-operate, manage, and maintain several fixed-route service bus routes and designated
20-supplemental special Circulator service routes for the Department of Transportation, and
21-to authorize payment for the goods and services to be received under the modification.
22-
71+Modification No. 12 to Contract
72+No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RA TP Dev USA, Inc. to
73+operate, manage, and maintain several fixed-route service
74+bus routes and designated
75+supplemental special Circulator service routes for the Department
76+of Transportation.
2377 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
24-resolution may be cited as the “Multiyear Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-
25-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”.
26-
27- Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve multiyear Modification No. 12 to
28-Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. to operate, manage, and maintain
78+resolution may be cited as the "Multiyear Modification
79+No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-
80+0052 with
81+RA TP Dev USA, Inc. Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023".
82+Sec. 2. (a)
83+There exists an immediate need to approve multiyear Modification No. 12 to
84+Contract No.
85+DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. to operate, manage, and maintain
2986 several fixed-route service bus routes and designated supplemental special Circulator service
30-routes for the District Department of Transportation.
31-(b) The Office of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf of the Department of
87+routes for the District Department
88+of Transportation.
89+(b)
90+The Office of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf of the Department of
3291 Transportation, proposes to enter into Modification No. 12 for the period October 1, 2023
33-through September 30, 2028, in the not-to-exceed amount of $159,995,322.
34- (c) Council approval is necessary for multiyear contracts under section 451(c)(3) of the
35-District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official
36-Code § 1-204.51(c)(3)).
37- (d) Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the District to receive the
38-benefit of these services in a timely manner from RATP Dev USA, Inc.
39-(e) These critical services can only be obtained through an award of the multiyear
40-modification with RATP Dev USA, Inc.
41-
42- Sec 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute
43-emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Multiyear Modification No. 12 to
44-Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc. Emergency Approval Resolution
45-of 2023 be adopted on an emergency basis.
46- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
51-
52-
53- Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
92+through September 30, 2028 in the not-to-exceed amount
93+of $159,995,322.
94+1 32 ( c) Council approval is necessary for multi year contracts under section 451 ( c )(3) of the
95+33 District
96+of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official
97+34
98+Code§ l-204.51(c)(3).
99+35 (d) Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the District to receive the
100+36 benefit
101+of these services in a timely manner from RA TP Dev USA, Inc.
102+37 (e) These critical services
103+can only be obtained through an award of the multi year
104+38 modification with
105+RA TP Dev USA, Inc.
106+39 Sec 3. The Council
107+of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances
108+40 enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the
109+41 Multiyear Modification No. 12 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0052 with RATP Dev USA, Inc.
110+42 Emergency Approval Resolution
111+of 2023 be adopted after a single reading.
112+43 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
113+2