District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0349 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6- 1
7-A RESOLUTION
8-
9-25-201
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-July 11, 2023
14-
15-
16-To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos.
17-11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation to
18-provide community dining and home-delivered meals to Department of Aging and
19-Community Living program participants, and to authorize payment for the goods and
20-services received and to be received under the contract.
21-
22-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
23-resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No.
24-CW98887 with Great American Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency
25-Declaration Resolution of 2023”.
26-
27-Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to
28-Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation to provide community
29-dining and home-delivered meals to Department of Aging and Community Living program
30-participants and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received
31-under the contract.
32-(b) By Modification No. 11, dated May 16, 2023, the Office of Contracting and
33-Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Aging and Community Living, exercised a part of
34-option year one of Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 for the period May 16, 2023 through
35-July 15, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of $679,632.93.
36-(c) Modification No. 12 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option year one
37-for the period July 16, 2023 through May 15, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount of
38-$3,398,164.65, which will increase the total not-to-exceed amount for option year one to
39-$4,077,797.58.
40-(d) Council approval is required by section 451(b)(1) of the District of Columbia Home
41-Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51(b)(1)),
42-because the modifications will increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million during a
43-12-month period.
44- (e) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without this
45-approval, Great American Corporation cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess
46-of $1 million for the period May 16, 2023 through May 15, 2024. ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
1+MURIEL BOWSER
2+MAYOR
3+June 30, 2023
4+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
5+Chairman
6+Council
7+of the District of Columbia
8+John A. Wilson Building
9+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 504
10+Washington, D.C. 20004
11+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
12+Enclosed for consideration and enactment
13+by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed
14+bill, the "Modification Nos.
15+11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great
16+American Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act
17+of 2023," and the
18+accompanying emergency declaration resolution.
19+The legislation will approve Modification
20+No. 11 and proposed Modification No. 12 to Human
21+Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation to provide community dining
22+and home-delivered meals to the Department
23+of Aging and Community Living and authorize
24+payment in the not-to-exceed amount
25+of $4,077,797.58 for the period May 16, 2023 through May
26+15, 2024.
27+If you have any questions regarding this legislation, please have your staff contact Marc Scott,
28+Chief Operating Officer at the Office of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759.
29+I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action on the enclosed legislation.
30+Sincerely, 1
5131 2
52-Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute
53-emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human
54-Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation Approval and Payment
55-Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading.
56-
57-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
32+3
33+4
34+5
35+6
36+7
37+Chairman Phil Mendelson
38+at the request of the Mayor
39+8 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
40+9
41+10
42+11
43+12 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
44+13
45+14
46+15
47+16
48+17
49+To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve
50+18 Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with
51+19 Great American Corporation to provide community dining and home-delivered
52+20 meals to Department of Aging and Community Living program participants, and
53+21 to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under
54+22 the modifications.
55+23
56+24 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That
57+25 this resolution may be cited as the "Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human Care
58+26 Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation Approval and Payment
59+27 Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023".
60+28 Sec. 2. (a)
61+There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 11 and
62+29 12 to Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation to
63+30 provide community dining and home-delivered meals to Department of Aging and
64+31 Community Living program participants, and to authorize payment for the goods and
65+32 services received and to be received under the modifications.
66+33 (b)
67+By Modification No. 11, dated May 16, 2023, the Office of Contracting and
68+34 Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Aging and Community Living, exercised a 35 part of option year one of Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 for the period May 16,
69+36 2023 through July 15, 2023 in the not-to-exceed amount
70+of $679,632.93.
71+37 (c) Modification No.
72+12 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option
73+38 year one for the period July 16, 2023 through
74+May 15, 2024 in the not-to-exceed amount
75+39
76+of $3,398,164.65, which will increase the total not-to-exceed amount for option year one
77+40 to $4,077,797.58.
78+41 ( d) Council approval is required by section 451 (b )(1) of the District of Columbia
79+42
80+Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code§ 1-
81+43 204.51(b)(l)) since the modifications will increase the value of the contract to more than
82+44 $1 million during a 12-month period.
83+45 (e) Approval
84+is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.
85+46 Without this approval, Great American Corporation cannot be paid for goods and
86+4 7 services provided in excess
87+of $1 million for the period May 16, 2023 through May 15,
88+48 2024.
89+49 Sec. 3.
90+The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the
91+50 circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it
92+51 necessary that the Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No.
93+52 CW98887 with Great American Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization
94+53 Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading.
95+54 Sec.
96+4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
97+2