District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0349 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/11/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-201  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 11, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos. 
11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation to 
provide community dining and home-delivered meals to Department of Aging and 
Community Living program participants, and to authorize payment for the goods and 
services received and to be received under the contract. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No. 
CW98887 with Great American Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a)  There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to 
Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation to provide community 
dining and home-delivered meals to Department of Aging and Community Living program 
participants and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received 
under the contract.  
(b)  By Modification No. 11, dated May 16, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Aging and Community Living, exercised a part of 
option year one of Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 for the period May 16, 2023 through 
July 15, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of $679,632.93.  
(c)  Modification No. 12 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option year one 
for the period July 16, 2023 through May 15, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount of 
$3,398,164.65, which will increase the total not-to-exceed amount for option year one to 
$4,077,797.58. 
(d)  Council approval is required by section 451(b)(1) of the District of Columbia Home 
Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51(b)(1)), 
because the modifications will increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million during a 
12-month period.   
  (e)  Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.  Without this 
approval, Great American Corporation cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess 
of $1 million for the period May 16, 2023 through May 15, 2024.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human 
Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.