District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0354 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/11/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-198  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 11, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos. 
13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20 to Contract No. CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC to 
provide occupational and ancillary healthcare services at the Police and Fire Clinic, and 
to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the 
modifications. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20 to Contract 
No. CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 13, 14, 15, 16, 
17, 18, 19, and 20 to Contract No. CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC to provide occupational 
and ancillary healthcare services at the Police and Fire Clinic, and to authorize payment for the 
goods and services received and to be received under the modifications. 
(b)  By Modification No. 13, dated August 10, 2022, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised a part of Option Year 4 
of Contract No. CW62890 for the period August 22, 2022 through September 30, 2022, in the 
not-to-exceed amount of $1,969,094.95. 
(c) By Modification No. 14, dated September 29, 2022, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another part of Option 
Year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period October 1, 2022 through November 30, 2022, in 
the additional not-to-exceed amount of $3,162,272.88. 
(d)  By Modification No. 15, dated November 30, 2022, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another part of Option 
Year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period December 1, 2022 through December 30, 2022, 
in the additional not-to-exceed amount of $1,602,983.96. 
(e)  By Modification No. 16, dated December 21, 2022, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another part of Option 
Year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period January 1, 2023 through February 28, 2023, in 
the additional not-to-exceed amount of $3,162,272.88.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	2 
(f)  By Modification No. 17, dated February 28, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another part of Option 
Year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period March 1, 2023 through April 30, 2023, in the 
additional not-to-exceed amount of $3,162,272.88. 
(g)  By Modification No. 18, dated April 10, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another part of Option 
Year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period May 1, 2023 through June 30, 2023, in the 
additional not-to-exceed amount of $2,827,894.00 
(h)  Modification No. 19 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of Option Year 4 for 
the period July 1, 2023 through August 21, 2023, in the additional not-to-exceed amount of 
$2,993,768.65, which will increase the total not-to-exceed amount for Option Year 4 to 
$18,880,560.20. 
(i)  Modification No. 20 is also now necessary to extend the term of the contract, on a 
sole source basis, for the period August 22, 2023 through August 21, 2024, in the not-to-exceed 
amount of $19,755,480.84. 
(j)  Council approval is required by section 451(b) of the District of Columbia Home 
Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51(b)), as 
these modifications increase the contract to more than $1 million during a 12-month period 
during both the contract period beginning August 22, 2022 through August 21, 2023, and the 
contract period beginning August 22, 2023, through August 21, 2024.   
  (k)  Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.  Without this 
approval, PFC Associates, LLC cannot be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 
million for the contract period beginning August 22, 2022 through August 21, 2023, or the 
contract period beginning August 22, 2023, through August 21, 2024. 
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 
19, and 20 to Contract No. CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.