District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0378 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-1
7-
8-AN ACT
9-
10-_________
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-_____________________
15-
16-
17-To amend, on temporary basis, the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to remove the
18-requirement that eligible students in the District receive a vaccination against COVID-19;
19-and to repeal the Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment
20-Act of 2022.
21-
22-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
23-act may be cited as the “School Student Vaccination Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”.
24-
25-Sec. 2. The Immunization of School Students Act of 1979, effective September 28, 1979
26-(D.C. Law 3-20: D.C. Official Code § 38-501 et seq.), is amended as follows:
27-(a) Section 2(2A) (D.C. Official Code § 38-501(2A)) is repealed.
28-(b) Section 3a (D.C. Official Code § 38-502.01) is repealed.
29-(c) Section 4 (D.C. Official Code § 38-503) is amended by striking the phrase “;
30-provided, that the Mayor may not issue regulations that conflict with the requirements of section
31-3a.” and inserting a period in its place.
32-
33-Sec. 3. The Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment Act
34-of 2022, effective February 23, 2023, (D.C. Law 24-274; 69 DCR 15080), is repealed.
35-
36-Sec. 4. Applicability.
37-This act shall apply as of July 31, 2023.
38-
39-Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.
40-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
41-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
42-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
43-
44-Sec. 6. Effective date.
45-(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by
46-the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
51-2
52-
53-as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December
54-24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of
55-Columbia Register.
56-(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect.
57-
58-
59-______________________________
1+ MURIELBOWSER,
2+‘MAYOR
3+September18,2023
4+HonorablePhilMendelson
605 Chairman
616 CounciloftheDistrictofColumbia
62-
63-
64-
65-
66-_________________________________
67-Mayor
68-District of Columbia
69-
7+JohnA.WilsonBuilding
8+1350PennsylvaniaAvenue,NW,Suite504
9+Washington,DC20004
10+DearChairmanMendelson:
11+EnclosedforconsiderationandenactmentbytheCounciloftheDistrictofColumbiaisproposed
12+bill,the“ContractNo.CW103879withSAMUFoundationd/b/aSAMUFirstResponseApproval
13+andPaymentAuthorizationEmergencyActof2023,”andtheaccompanyingemergency
14+declarationresolution.
15+ThelegislationwillapprovethebaseperiodofemergencyContractNo.CW103879withSAMU.
16+Foundationd/b/aSAMUFirstResponsetomanagemigrantserviceintakecentersandtemporary
17+lodgingsitesfortheDepartmentofHumanServices.Inaddition,thelegislationwillapprove
18+paymentforservicesreceivedandtobereceivedunderthecontract.
19+Ifyouhaveanyquestionsregardingthislegislation,pleasehaveyourstaffcontactMareScott,
20+ChiefOperatingOfficer,OfficeofContractingandProcurement,at(202)724-8759.
21+TurgetheCounciltotakepromptandfavorableactionontheenclosedlegislation.
22+Sincerely,
23+Muri]Bowst 1
24+ 1
25+_______________________ 2
26+ Chairman Phil Mendelson 3
27+at the request of the Mayor 4
28+ 5
29+ 6
30+ 7
31+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8
32+ 9
33+__________ 10
34+ 11
35+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12
36+ 13
37+__________________ 14
38+ 15
39+ 16
40+To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract 17
41+No. CW103879 with S AMU Foundation d/b/a SAMU First Response to manage 18
42+migrant service i ntake centers and temporary lodging sites for the Department of 19
43+Human Services, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received 20
44+and to be received under the contract. 21
45+ 22
46+RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 23
47+this resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. CW103879 with S AMU Foundation 24
48+d/b/a SAMU First Response Approval and Payment Authorization Emergenc y 25
49+Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 26
50+Sec. 2. (a) There exists a need to approve Contract No. CW103879 with S AMU 27
51+Foundation d/b/a SAMU First Response to manage migrant service i ntake centers and 28
52+temporary lodging sites for the Department of Human Services, and to authorize payment 29
53+for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract. 30
54+(b) On March 13, 2023, the Office of Contracting and Procurement, on be half of 31
55+the Department of Human Services, awarded Contract No. C W103879 on an emergency 32
56+basis, with a base period of March 6, 2023 through S eptember 30, 2023 i n the not-to-33
57+exceed amount of $2,964 ,514.56. 34 2
58+(c) Council approval is required by section 451(b) of the District of Columbia 35
59+Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-36
60+204.51(b)) since t he contract is in excess $1 million during a 12-month period. 37
61+ (d) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. 38
62+Without this approval, with S AMU Foundation d/b/a SAMU First Response cannot be 39
63+paid for goods and se rvices provided in excess of $1 million for the contract period 40
64+March 6, 2023 through S eptember 30, 2023. 41
65+Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines th at the 42
66+circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it 43
67+necessary that the Contract No. Contract No. Contract No. C W103879 with S AMU 44
68+Foundation d/b/a SAMU First Response Approval and Payment Authorization 45
69+Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 46
70+Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 47