District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0378 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/19/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_____________________ 
 
 
To amend, on temporary basis, the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to remove the 
requirement that eligible students in the District receive a vaccination against COVID-19; 
and to repeal the Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment 
Act of 2022. 
  
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “School Student Vaccination Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. The Immunization of School Students Act of 1979, effective September 28, 1979 
(D.C. Law 3-20: D.C. Official Code § 38-501 et seq.), is amended as follows: 
(a) Section 2(2A) (D.C. Official Code § 38-501(2A)) is repealed. 
(b) Section 3a (D.C. Official Code § 38-502.01) is repealed. 
(c) Section 4 (D.C. Official Code § 38-503) is amended by striking the phrase “; 
provided, that the Mayor may not issue regulations that conflict with the requirements of section 
3a.” and inserting a period in its place. 
 
Sec. 3. The Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment Act 
of 2022, effective February 23, 2023, (D.C. Law 24-274; 69 DCR 15080), is repealed. 
 
Sec. 4. Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of July 31, 2023. 
 
Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
Sec. 6. Effective date.  
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 
Columbia Register.  
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia