District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0438 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+1
22
3+ _______________________________ 1
4+ Chairman Phil Mendelson 2
5+ 3
6+ 4
7+ 5
8+ 6
9+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7
10+ 8
11+_______ 9
12+ 10
13+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11
14+ 12
15+____________________ 13
16+ 14
17+To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 15
18+to open streets in Square S-5868, and to designate the opened streets as Cypress Street, 16
19+SE, Poplar Street, SE, Sycamore Drive, SE, and Oak Drive, SE, in Ward 8. 17
20+ 18
21+RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 19
22+resolution may be cited as the “Opening of Streets and Designation of Opened Streets in Square 20
23+S-5868, S.O. 22- 01486, Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 21
24+Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council approved the Opening of Streets and 22
25+Designation of Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22- 01486, Emergency Act of 2023, 23
26+effective July 231, 2023 (D.C. Act 25- 187; 70 DCR 10714) (“emergency measure”). The 24
27+emergency measure is set to expire on October 29, 2023. 25
28+(b) The Opening of Streets and Designation of Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22-26
29+01486 (Bill 25-145) was approved by the Council on final reading at the September 19, 2023 27
30+legislative meeting. Because the permanent measure must undergo congressional review, it will 28
31+not be in effect before the emergency measure expires. 29
32+(c) This congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 30
33+the expiration of the emergency measure and effective date of the permanent measure. 31 2
334
4-
5-
6-
7-
8-A RESOLUTION
9-
10-25-272
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-October 3, 2023
15-
16-
17-To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need
18-to open streets in Square S-5868, and to designate the opened streets as Cypress Street,
19-SE, Poplar Street, SE, Sycamore Drive, SE, and Oak Drive, SE, in Ward 8.
20-
21-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
22-resolution may be cited as the “Opening of Streets and Designation of Opened Streets in Square
23-S-5868, S.O. 22-01486, Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”.
24-
25-Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council approved the Opening of Streets and
26-Designation of Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22-01486, Emergency Act of 2023,
27-effective July 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-187; 70 DCR 10714) (“emergency measure”). The
28-emergency measure is set to expire on October 29, 2023.
29-(b) The Opening of Streets and Designation of Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22-
30-01486, Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-
31-145) (“permanent measure”), was approved by the Council on final reading at the September 19,
32-2023 legislative meeting. Because the permanent measure must undergo congressional review, it
33-will not be in effect before the emergency measure expires.
34-(c) This congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between
35-the expiration of the emergency measure and effective date of the permanent measure.
36-
37-Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute
38-emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Opening of Streets and Designation of
39-Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22-01486, Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023
40-be adopted after a single reading.
41-
42-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
35+Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 32
36+enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 33
37+Opening of Streets and Designation of Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22- 01486, 34
38+Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 35
39+Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 36