District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0438 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/03/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-272  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to open streets in Square S-5868, and to designate the opened streets as Cypress Street, 
SE, Poplar Street, SE, Sycamore Drive, SE, and Oak Drive, SE, in Ward 8. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Opening of Streets and Designation of Opened Streets in Square 
S-5868, S.O. 22-01486, Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council approved the Opening of Streets and 
Designation of Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22-01486, Emergency Act of 2023, 
effective July 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-187; 70 DCR 10714) (“emergency measure”). The 
emergency measure is set to expire on October 29, 2023.  
(b) The Opening of Streets and Designation of Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22-
01486, Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-
145) (“permanent measure”), was approved by the Council on final reading at the September 19, 
2023 legislative meeting. Because the permanent measure must undergo congressional review, it 
will not be in effect before the emergency measure expires. 
(c) This congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 
the expiration of the emergency measure and effective date of the permanent measure. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Opening of Streets and Designation of 
Opened Streets in Square S-5868, S.O. 22-01486, Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 
be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.