District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0439 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-A RESOLUTION
7-
8-25-274
9-
10-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
11-
12-October 3, 2023
13-
14-To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need
15-to amend the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to remove the requirement
16-that eligible students in the District of Columbia receive a vaccination against COVID-
17-19; and to repeal the Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary
18-Amendment Act of 2022.
19-
20-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
21-resolution may be cited as the “School Student Vaccination Congressional Review Emergency
22-Declaration Resolution of 2023”.
23-
24-Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the School Student Vaccination
25-Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-200; 70 DCR 10752),
26-which is set to expire on October 29, 2023.
27-(b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed on second reading the School Student
28-Vaccination Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023
29-(Enrolled version of Bill 25-378), which is currently under Mayoral review and then must pass
30-congressional review.
31-(c) This identical congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a
32-gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the
33-temporary act.
34-
35-Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute
36-emergency circumstances making it necessary that the School Student Vaccination
37-Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading.
38-
39-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
40-
41-
42-
1+ 1
2+_____________________________ _____________________________ 1
3+Chairman Phil Mendelson Councilmember Christina Henderson 2
4+ 3
5+ 4
6+ 5
7+ 6
8+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7
9+ 8
10+ 9
11+_________ 10
12+ 11
13+ 12
14+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13
15+ 14
16+__________________ 15
17+ 16
18+To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 17
19+to amend the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to remove the requirement 18
20+that eligible students in the District of Columbia receive a vaccination against COVID-19
21+19; and to repeal the Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary 20
22+Amendment Act of 2022. 21
23+ 22
24+RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23
25+resolution may be cited as the “School Student Vaccination Emergency Congressional Review 24
26+Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 25
27+Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council adopted the “School Student Vaccination 26
28+Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. The Act became law on July 31, 2023, and is set to expire 27
29+on October 29, 2023. 28
30+(b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the “School Student Vaccination 29
31+Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. The temporary measure is currently under Mayoral 30
32+review and then it must pass Congressional review. 31
33+(c) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 32
34+the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 33 2
35+Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 34
36+enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the School 35
37+Student Vaccination Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 36
38+Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 37