District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0439 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/03/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-274  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to remove the requirement 
that eligible students in the District of Columbia receive a vaccination against COVID-
19; and to repeal the Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary 
Amendment Act of 2022. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “School Student Vaccination Congressional Review Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a)  On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the School Student Vaccination 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-200; 70 DCR 10752), 
which is set to expire on October 29, 2023.  
(b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed on second reading the School Student 
Vaccination Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 
(Enrolled version of Bill 25-378), which is currently under Mayoral review and then must pass 
congressional review.  
(c) This identical congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a 
gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the 
temporary act.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the School Student Vaccination 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.