| 5 | + | ______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 6 | + | Councilmember Brooke Pinto 2 |
---|
| 7 | + | 3 |
---|
| 8 | + | 4 |
---|
| 9 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 5 |
---|
| 10 | + | 6 |
---|
| 11 | + | _______________ 7 |
---|
| 12 | + | 8 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 |
---|
| 14 | + | 10 |
---|
| 15 | + | ________________________ 11 |
---|
| 16 | + | 12 |
---|
| 17 | + | 13 |
---|
| 18 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 14 |
---|
| 19 | + | to amend the Office of Unified Communications Establishment Act of 2004 to require the 15 |
---|
| 20 | + | Office of Unified Communications to collect and post publicly on the Office’s website 16 |
---|
| 21 | + | the number of calls eligible to be diverted to alternative responses, the number of those 17 |
---|
| 22 | + | calls diverted, and data on daily call-taking and dispatching operations; and to amend 18 |
---|
| 23 | + | section 16-1053 of the District of Columbia Official Code to add a representative of the 19 |
---|
| 24 | + | Office of Unified Communications as a member of the Domestic Violence Fatality 20 |
---|
| 25 | + | Review Board. 21 |
---|
| 26 | + | 22 |
---|
| 27 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23 |
---|
| 28 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy 24 |
---|
| 29 | + | Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 25 |
---|
| 30 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Office of Unified Communications 26 |
---|
| 31 | + | Transparency and Accuracy Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. 27 |
---|
| 32 | + | Act 25-198; 70 DCR 10746) (“emergency act”), which expires on October 25, 2023. 28 |
---|
| 33 | + | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Office of Unified Communications 29 |
---|
| 34 | + | Transparency and Accuracy Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on 30 |
---|
| 35 | + | September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-375) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have 31 |
---|
| 36 | + | a projected law date. 32 |
---|
| 37 | + | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 33 |
---|
| 38 | + | expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 34 |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-265 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | October 3, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
18 | | - | to amend the Office of Unified Communications Establishment Act of 2004 to require the |
---|
19 | | - | Office of Unified Communications to collect and post publicly on the Office’s website |
---|
20 | | - | the number of calls eligible to be diverted to alternative responses, the number of those |
---|
21 | | - | calls diverted, and data on daily call-taking and dispatching operations; and to amend |
---|
22 | | - | section 16-1053 of the District of Columbia Official Code to add a representative of the |
---|
23 | | - | Office of Unified Communications as a member of the Domestic Violence Fatality |
---|
24 | | - | Review Board. |
---|
25 | | - | |
---|
26 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
27 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy |
---|
28 | | - | Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
29 | | - | |
---|
30 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Office of Unified Communications |
---|
31 | | - | Transparency and Accuracy Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. |
---|
32 | | - | Act 25-198; 70 DCR 10746) (“emergency act”), which expires on October 25, 2023. |
---|
33 | | - | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Office of Unified Communications |
---|
34 | | - | Transparency and Accuracy Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on |
---|
35 | | - | September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-375) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have |
---|
36 | | - | a projected law date. |
---|
37 | | - | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the |
---|
38 | | - | expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
39 | | - | |
---|
40 | | - | Sec. 3 The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
41 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Office of Unified Communications |
---|
42 | | - | Transparency and Accuracy Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be |
---|
43 | | - | adopted after a single reading. |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 42 | + | Sec. 3 The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 35 |
---|
| 43 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Office 36 |
---|
| 44 | + | of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Congressional Review Emergency 37 |
---|
| 45 | + | Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 38 |
---|
| 46 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 39 |
---|