District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0453 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/03/2023

                             ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-265  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Office of Unified Communications Establishment Act of 2004 to require the 
Office of Unified Communications to collect and post publicly on the Office’s website 
the number of calls eligible to be diverted to alternative responses, the number of those 
calls diverted, and data on daily call-taking and dispatching operations; and to amend 
section 16-1053 of the District of Columbia Official Code to add a representative of the 
Office of Unified Communications as a member of the Domestic Violence Fatality 
Review Board. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy 
Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Office of Unified Communications 
Transparency and Accuracy Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. 
Act 25-198; 70 DCR 10746) (“emergency act”), which expires on October 25, 2023. 
(b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Office of Unified Communications 
Transparency and Accuracy Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on 
September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-375) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have 
a projected law date. 
(c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 
expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  
 
Sec. 3 The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Office of Unified Communications 
Transparency and Accuracy Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be 
adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.