3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | 25-273 |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | October 3, 2023 |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
15 | | - | to amend the Department of For-Hire Vehicles Establishment Act of 1985 to authorize |
---|
16 | | - | the Department of For-Hire Vehicles to enforce traffic laws against carrier-for-hire |
---|
17 | | - | vehicles. |
---|
18 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
19 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Department of For-Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic |
---|
20 | | - | Enforcement Expansion Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
21 | | - | |
---|
22 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Department of For-Hire Vehicles |
---|
23 | | - | Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective |
---|
24 | | - | July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-195; 70 DCR 10737) (“emergency act”). The emergency act will |
---|
25 | | - | expire on October 25, 2023. |
---|
26 | | - | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Department of For-Hire Vehicles |
---|
27 | | - | Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed |
---|
28 | | - | on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-370) (“temporary act”). The |
---|
29 | | - | temporary act is now pending Mayoral review. |
---|
30 | | - | (c) To prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the |
---|
31 | | - | effective date of the temporary act, it is now necessary to pass this congressional review |
---|
32 | | - | emergency legislation. |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
35 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Department of For-Hire Vehicles |
---|
36 | | - | Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Congressional Review Emergency |
---|
37 | | - | Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
38 | | - | |
---|
39 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 2 | + | 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | ___________________________ ______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 4 | + | Councilmember Brianne K. Nadeau Councilmember Charles Allen 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | ____________ 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | ___________________________ 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | amend the Department of For-Hire Vehicles Establishment Act of 1985 to authorize the 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | Department of For-Hire Vehicles to enforce traffic laws against carrier-for-hire vehicles. 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Department of For-Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | Enforcement Expansion Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Department of For-Hire Vehicles 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-195; 70 DCR 10737) (“emergency act”). The emergency act will expire 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | on October 25, 2023. 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Department of For-Hire Vehicles 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-370) (“temporary act”). The 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | temporary act is now pending Mayoral review. 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | (c) To prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | effective date of the temporary act, it is now necessary to pass this congressional review emergency 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | legislation. 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | 2 |
---|
| 36 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 33 |
---|
| 37 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 34 |
---|
| 38 | + | Department of For-Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Congressional 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 37 |
---|