District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0458 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/03/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-273  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
  
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Department of For-Hire Vehicles Establishment Act of 1985 to authorize 
the Department of For-Hire Vehicles to enforce traffic laws against carrier-for-hire 
vehicles. 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Department of For-Hire Vehicles Delivery Vehicle Traffic 
Enforcement Expansion Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Department of For-Hire Vehicles 
Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective 
July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-195; 70 DCR 10737) (“emergency act”). The emergency act will 
expire on October 25, 2023. 
 (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Department of For-Hire Vehicles 
Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed 
on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-370) (“temporary act”). The 
temporary act is now pending Mayoral review. 
 (c) To prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the 
effective date of the temporary act, it is now necessary to pass this congressional review 
emergency legislation. 
 
 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Department of For-Hire Vehicles 
Delivery Vehicle Traffic Enforcement Expansion Congressional Review Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.