1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | 25-275 |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | October 3, 2023 |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
16 | | - | to amend the Youth Employment Act of 1979 to establish a Middle School Career |
---|
17 | | - | Exploration Pilot program to provide soft skills training and volunteer opportunities to |
---|
18 | | - | young teens. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
21 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Middle School Career Exploration Pilot Congressional Review |
---|
22 | | - | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Middle School Career Exploration |
---|
25 | | - | Pilot Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-205; 70 DCR |
---|
26 | | - | 10765), which is set to expire on October 29, 2023. |
---|
27 | | - | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the Middle School Career Exploration |
---|
28 | | - | Pilot Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 |
---|
29 | | - | (Enrolled version of Bill 25-398), which is currently under Mayoral review and then must pass |
---|
30 | | - | congressional review. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) This identical congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a |
---|
32 | | - | gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the |
---|
33 | | - | temporary act. |
---|
34 | | - | |
---|
35 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
36 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Middle School Career Exploration Pilot |
---|
37 | | - | Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
38 | | - | |
---|
39 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 1 | + | ______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | Councilmember Christina Henderson 2 |
---|
| 3 | + | 3 |
---|
| 4 | + | 4 |
---|
| 5 | + | 5 |
---|
| 6 | + | 6 |
---|
| 7 | + | 7 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 9 | + | 9 |
---|
| 10 | + | _________ 10 |
---|
| 11 | + | 11 |
---|
| 12 | + | 12 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 |
---|
| 14 | + | 14 |
---|
| 15 | + | __________________ 15 |
---|
| 16 | + | 16 |
---|
| 17 | + | 17 |
---|
| 18 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 18 |
---|
| 19 | + | to amend the Youth Employment Act of 1979 to establish a Middle School Career 19 |
---|
| 20 | + | Exploration Pilot program to provide soft skills training and volunteer opportunities to 20 |
---|
| 21 | + | young teens. 21 |
---|
| 22 | + | 22 |
---|
| 23 | + | RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23 |
---|
| 24 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Middle School Career Exploration Pilot Congressional Review 24 |
---|
| 25 | + | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 25 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council adopted the “Middle School Career Exploration 26 |
---|
| 27 | + | Pilot Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. The Act became law on July 31, 2023, and is set to 27 |
---|
| 28 | + | expire on October 29, 2023. 28 |
---|
| 29 | + | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the “Middle School Career Exploration 29 |
---|
| 30 | + | Pilot Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. The temporary measure is currently under Mayoral 30 |
---|
| 31 | + | review and then it must pass Congressional review. 31 |
---|
| 32 | + | (c) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 32 |
---|
| 33 | + | the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 33 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 34 |
---|
| 34 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Middle 35 |
---|
| 35 | + | School Career Exploration Pilot Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single 36 |
---|
| 36 | + | reading. 37 |
---|
| 37 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 38 |
---|