District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0462 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/03/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-275  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Youth Employment Act of 1979 to establish a Middle School Career 
Exploration Pilot program to provide soft skills training and volunteer opportunities to 
young teens. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Middle School Career Exploration Pilot Congressional Review 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Middle School Career Exploration 
Pilot Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-205; 70 DCR 
10765), which is set to expire on October 29, 2023.  
(b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the Middle School Career Exploration 
Pilot Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 
(Enrolled version of Bill 25-398), which is currently under Mayoral review and then must pass 
congressional review.  
(c) This identical congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a 
gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the 
temporary act.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Middle School Career Exploration Pilot 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.