District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0496 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 MURIEL BOWSER
66 MAYOR
77
88 October 26, 2023
99
1010 The Honorable Phil Mendelson
1111 Chairman
1212 Council of the District of Columbia
1313 John A. Wilson Building
1414 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504
1515 Washington, DC 20004
1616
1717
1818 Dear Chairman Mendelson:
1919
2020 In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law
2121 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1- 523.01) , and pursuant to section 3042 of the Fatality Review
2222 Committee Amendment Act of 2018, effective October 30, 2018 (D.C. Law 22- 168; D.C. Official
2323 Code § 5- 1431.01), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:
2424
2525 Ms. Helaina Roisman
2626 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
2727 Washington, DC 20009
2828 (Ward 1)
2929
3030
3131 for reappointment as a representative from a hospital located in the District member of the
3232 Violence Fatality Review Committee , for a term to end October 12, 2025.
3333
3434 Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned
3535 nominee, together with proposed resolutions to assist the Council during the confirmation process.
3636
3737
3838 I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please
3939 do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and
4040 Appointments, should the Council require additional information.
4141
4242
4343 Sincerely,
4444
4545
4646
4747 Muriel Bowser 1
4848 2
4949 3
5050 4
5151 5
5252 6
5353 7
5454 8
5555 9
5656 10
5757 11
5858 12
5959 13
6060 at the request of the Mayor
6161 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
6262 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
6363 14 To confirm the reappointment of Ms. Helaina Reisman to the Violence Fatality Review
6464 15 Committee.
6565 16
6666 17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
6767 18 resolution may be cited as the "Violence Fatality Review Committee Helaina Reisman
6868 19 Confirmation Resolution of 2023 ".
6969 20
7070 21 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of:
7171 22
7272 23
7373 24
7474 25
7575 26
7676 27
7777 28
7878 Ms. Helaina Reisman
7979 New Hampshire Avenue
8080 Washington, DC 20009
8181 (Ward
8282 1)
8383 29 as a representative from a hospital located in the District member of the Violence Fatality
8484 30 Review Committee, established by section 3042 of the Fatality Review Committee Amendment
8585 31 Act of 2018, effective October 30, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-168; D.C. Official Code§ 5-1431.01), for
8686 32 a term to end October 12, 2025.
8787 33 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution,
8888 34 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor.
8989 35 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. HELAINA ROISMAN
9090 2039 New Hampshire Avenue Unit 205, Washington, DC 20009
9191 (917) 572-0008; helainabernstein@gmail.com
9292 E X P E R I E N C E
9393 LICENSED INDEPENDENT CLINICAL SOCIAL WORKER December
9494 2017- Present
9595 Licensed in the District of Columbia to practice social work independently.
9696 GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, Washington, DC May 2015 – Present
9797 Injury Prevention and Outreach Coordinator
9898 Work with hospital personnel as well as community and government leaders and organizations to
9999 educate and help prevent injuries, including alcohol and drug related injury prevention, violent related injury
100100 prevention, falls related injury prevention, and bicycle and pedestrian safety. Gather information and data from
101101 trauma team, ICU staff and patients on injuries to inform future prevention efforts. Collaborate with local
102102 trauma centers and community agencies on injury prevention efforts. Create and distribute educational materials
103103 highlighting leading causes of traumatic injury and appropriate safety measures. Sit on the advisory committee
104104 for State violence prevention initiatives, working closely with OCME and MPD on such efforts. Run the
105105 Trauma Survivors Network at GWUH, a national program for survivors of traumatic injury, which entails
106106 meeting with patients, offering resources, and providing forums to meet other trauma survivors.
107107 GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, Washington, DC September 2014 – May 2015
108108 Student Intern
109109 Work with social workers, doctors, nurses, graduate students and hospital staff to provide treatment for
110110 individuals presenting to the hospital with psychiatric needs. Conduct psychosocial assessments of individuals
111111 who present to the emergency department and to the inpatient psychiatric unit with psychiatric needs. Provide
112112 ongoing psychosocial support for individuals who are admitted to the inpatient psychiatric unit and facilitate
113113 multiple process-oriented therapy groups in the inpatient psychiatric unit. Conduct discharge planning with
114114 individuals including connection to appropriate resources in the community.
115115 BRINTON WOODS HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER, Washington, DC September 2013 – May 2014
116116 Student Intern
117117 Work with individuals and groups to promote physical, mental and emotional health and wellbeing. Participated
118118 in interdisciplinary team meetings with residents and residents’ family members to discuss initial care planning
119119 and ultimately discharge planning. Engaged and worked with government and community resources on behalf
120120 of residents.
121121 HEALTH COACH/NUTRITION COUNSELOR, New York, NY and Washington, DC
122122 2010 – 2014
123123 Worked as a Health Coach and Holistic Nutritional Counselor. Drawing on knowledge in holistic nutrition,
124124 preventative health and knowledge of different dietary theories, worked with clients to help them make lifestyle
125125 changes. Worked with clients individually and also performed group workshops at various organizations.
126126 E D U C A T I O N
127127 CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA, Washington, DC Master of Social Work, May
128128 2015
129129 Master of Social Work
130130 NEW YORK SCHOOL OF INTEGRATIVE NUTRITION, New York, NY
131131 H.C., 2010
132132 Received certification as a Holistic Health Practitioner.
133133 NEW YORK UNIVERSITY, New York, NY Bachelor of Arts, 2005
134134 Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments
135135 John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004
136136
137137
138138
139139
140140 Helaina Roisman
141141
142142 Helaina Roisman is the Injury Prevention and Outreach
143143 Coordinator at George Washington University Hospital. She
144144 works to help prevent injuries including alcohol and drug related
145145 prevention and violence related prevention. She works with
146146 trauma teams, intensive care unit staff, and patients to gain a
147147 better understanding of common ways to decrease injuries.
148148
149149 In her role at George Washington University Hospital she also
150150 runs the Trauma Survivors Network at the Hospital, which entails
151151 meeting with patients, offers resources, and allows trauma
152152 survivors to meet.
153153
154154 A Ward 1 resident, she received a B.A. from New York University and a Master of Social Work
155155 from Catholic University of America. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
156156 Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser
157157
158158 Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor
159159
160160
161161 ______________________________________________________________________________
162162 The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724 -7681
163163
164164 To: Tommy Wells, Steve Walker
165165 From: Betsy Cavendish
166166 Date: July 28, 2023
167167 Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Charlayne Hayling- Williams,
168168 Dr. Eric Li, Dr. Erin Hall, Helaina Roisman, Joseph Richardson, Juanita Price, Kenyatta Hazlewood, and Dr. Mallory Williams as members of the Violence
169169 Fatality Review Committee
170170 This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above- referenced resolutions and
171171 found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not
172172 hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-724-1303, or me at 202- 724-7681.
173173
174174
175175 ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish
176176