District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0496 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 10/26/2023

                             
 
 
 
MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
  
 October 26, 2023 
  
The Honorable Phil Mendelson   
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia  
John A. Wilson Building  
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504   
Washington, DC 20004  
  
  
Dear Chairman Mendelson:  
  
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-	523.01) , and pursuant to section 3042 of the Fatality Review 
Committee Amendment Act of 2018, effective October 30, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-	168; D.C. Official 
Code § 5- 1431.01), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:   
  
Ms. Helaina Roisman  
 New Hampshire Avenue, NW 
Washington, DC 20009 
(Ward 1) 
 
 
for reappointment as a 	representative from a hospital located in the District 	member of the 
Violence Fatality Review Committee	, for a term to end October 12, 2025.  
 
Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned 
nominee, together with proposed resolutions to assist the Council during the confirmation process.
 
 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
 
 
Sincerely, 
   
 
 
Muriel Bowser  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
at the request of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
14 To confirm the reappointment of Ms. Helaina Reisman to the Violence Fatality Review 
15 Committee. 
16 
17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Violence Fatality Review Committee Helaina Reisman 
19 Confirmation Resolution of 2023 ". 
20 
21 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment 	of: 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
Ms. Helaina Reisman 
New Hampshire Avenue 
Washington, DC 20009 
(Ward 
1) 
29 as a representative from a hospital located in the District member 	of the Violence Fatality 
30 Review Committee, established by section 3042 	of the Fatality Review Committee Amendment 
31 Act of 2018, effective October 30, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-168; D.C. Official 	Code§ 5-1431.01), for 
32 a term to end October 12, 2025. 
33 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
34 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
35 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  HELAINA ROISMAN
2039 New Hampshire Avenue Unit 205, Washington, DC 20009
(917) 572-0008; helainabernstein@gmail.com
E X P E R I E N C E
LICENSED INDEPENDENT CLINICAL SOCIAL WORKER              December 
2017- Present
Licensed in the District of Columbia to practice social work independently. 
GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, Washington, DC                     May 2015 – Present 
Injury Prevention and Outreach Coordinator
    Work with hospital personnel as well as community and government leaders and organizations to 
educate and help prevent injuries, including alcohol and drug related injury prevention, violent related injury 
prevention, falls related injury prevention, and bicycle and pedestrian safety. Gather information and data from 
trauma team, ICU staff and patients on injuries to inform future prevention efforts. Collaborate with local 
trauma centers and community agencies on injury prevention efforts. Create and distribute educational materials
highlighting leading causes of traumatic injury and appropriate safety measures. Sit on the advisory committee 
for State violence prevention initiatives, working closely with OCME and MPD on such efforts. Run the 
Trauma Survivors Network at GWUH, a national program for survivors of traumatic injury, which entails 
meeting with patients, offering resources, and providing forums to meet other trauma survivors.
GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, Washington, DC              September 2014 – May 2015
Student Intern 
Work with social workers, doctors, nurses, graduate students and hospital staff to provide treatment for 
individuals presenting to the hospital with psychiatric needs.  Conduct psychosocial assessments of individuals 
who present to the emergency department and to the inpatient psychiatric unit with psychiatric needs.  Provide 
ongoing psychosocial support for individuals who are admitted to the inpatient psychiatric unit and facilitate 
multiple process-oriented therapy groups in the inpatient psychiatric unit. Conduct discharge planning with 
individuals including connection to appropriate resources in the community.  
BRINTON WOODS HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER, Washington, DC              September 2013 – May 2014
Student Intern 
Work with individuals and groups to promote physical, mental and emotional health and wellbeing. Participated
in interdisciplinary team meetings with residents and residents’ family members to discuss initial care planning 
and ultimately discharge planning. Engaged and worked with government and community resources on behalf 
of residents.
HEALTH COACH/NUTRITION COUNSELOR, New York, NY and Washington, DC                   
2010 – 2014
Worked as a Health Coach and Holistic Nutritional Counselor. Drawing on knowledge in holistic nutrition, 
preventative health and knowledge of different dietary theories, worked with clients to help them make lifestyle 
changes. Worked with clients individually and also performed group workshops at various organizations. 
E D U C A T I O N
CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA, Washington, DC               Master of Social Work, May 
2015 
Master of Social Work
NEW YORK SCHOOL OF INTEGRATIVE NUTRITION, New York, NY           
H.C., 2010
Received certification as a Holistic Health Practitioner.
NEW YORK UNIVERSITY, New York, NY              Bachelor of Arts, 2005  
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, 	Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
    
 
 
Helaina Roisman 
 
Helaina Roisman is the Injury Prevention and Outreach 
Coordinator at George Washington University Hospital. She 
works to help prevent injuries including alcohol and drug related 
prevention and violence related prevention. She works with 
trauma teams, intensive care unit staff, and patients to gain a 
better understanding of common ways to decrease injuries. 
 
In her role at George Washington University Hospital she also 
runs the Trauma Survivors Network at the Hospital, which entails 
meeting with patients, offers resources, and allows trauma 
survivors to meet. 
 
A Ward 1 resident, she received a B.A. from New York University and a Master of Social Work 
from Catholic University of America.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724 -7681 
 
To:   Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   July 28, 2023 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Charlayne Hayling-	Williams, 
Dr. Eric Li, Dr. Erin Hall, Helaina Roisman, Joseph Richardson, Juanita Price, Kenyatta Hazlewood, and Dr. Mallory Williams as members of the Violence 
Fatality Review Committee 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  	If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 	202-724-1303, or me at 202-	724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 	Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish