Council | 02/16/2024 | Resolution R25-0414, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001669 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0414 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/18/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 01/17/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0506 | ||
Council | 01/16/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 01/11/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 01/05/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/02/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/22/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/15/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/14/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 11/03/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0506 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/26/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |