Council | 12/29/2023 | Resolution R25-0385, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016611 | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0385 | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/14/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 12/12/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0532 | ||
Council | 11/29/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0532 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/09/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |