Council | 03/15/2024 | Resolution R25-0438, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 002797 | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0438 | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 02/29/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 02/26/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0572 | ||
Council | 02/23/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 02/22/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 02/16/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/22/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0572 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 12/13/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |