District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0572 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/13/2023

                     
MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
 
December 13, 2023 
 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504  
Washington, DC 20004 
 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 205 of the Washington Convention 
Center Authority Act of 1994, effective September 28, 1994 (D.C. Law 10-188; D.C. Official Code § 
10-1202.05), I am pleased to nominate:  
 
Mr. Alan Bubes 
31st Street, NW 
Washington, DC 20007 
(Ward 3) 
 
for reappointment as a public member of the Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of 
Directors, for a term to end May 16, 2027. 
  
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above nominee, 
together with proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.  
 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. 
Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
 
 
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
Muriel Bowser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
13 To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Alan Bubes as a member of the Washington Convention 
14 and Sports Authority Board 	of Directors. 
15 
16 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
17 resolution may be cited as the "Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board 	of Directors 
18 Alan Bubes Confim1ation Resolution 	of 2023". 
19 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 
20 	Mr. Alan Bubes 
21 	31st Street, NW 
22 	Washington, DC 20007 
23 	(Ward 3) 
24 as a public member of the Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board 	of Directors, 
25 established by section 205 	of the Washington Convention Center Authority Act 	of 1994, 
26 effective September 28, 1994 (D.C. Law 10-188; D.	C. Official Code§ 10-1202.05), for a term 	to 
27 end May 16, 2027. 
28 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
29 upon its adoption, to the nominee and 	to the Office of the Mayor. 
30 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.   
Alan Bubes 
  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Education Sidwell Friends High School, Washington, DC Graduate 1970 
Georgia Institute of Technology, Atlanta GA 
B.S. Industrial Management 1974 
 
Numerous Management Classes & Seminars 1974 - Present 
 
 
Professional 
Experience 
1986-2012 Linens of the Week 	Washington, DC 
 
• Sold Linens of the Week a Regional Textile Supply & Rental Company in 2012 
• Held Position of President 1986-2000 
• 2000-2012 CEO 
• Company had major presence in numerous cities on the East coast and was 
one of the leading linen supply firms nationally 
1986-Present National Trade Associations 
• Served as Director many times 
 
1983-1986 Aramark Corporation 
• General Manager- Northeast Regional Manager 
Philadelphia, PA 
 
1982-1983 
• General Manager 
Unifirst Corporation 	Landover, MD 
 
1974-1982 Carter Service Industries Inc. 
• Family Owned, East Coast Uniform Rental Company 
• Held many positions - General Manager 
• Sold to Unifrst 1982 NYSE corporation 
Landover, MD  Charitable 
Endeavors Landon School - Bethesda, MD 
Lab School of Washington, DC 
St. Patrick's School, Washington, DC 
Adas Israel Congregation - Officer and Board of Managers 
Jewish Federation of Washington, DC 
Georgia Tech - Named Room in New Management Building 
Sidwell Friends School, Washington, DC 
Jelleff's Boys Club, Washington, DC 
Various Georgetown Area Charities - Contributed, Hosted many fund 
Raisers - including Rose Park, Volta Park, Georgetown Sr. Association, 
Leukemia Society, Lab School, Georgetown Ministries 
 
2013 - Shemtov Award Adas Israel Congregation 
2012 - Georgetown Ministries Honoree 
2011- Yachad Honoree 
Middle Atlantic PGA- Sponsored tournament many years 
Field of Dreams Founding Contributor 
Sponsor Northwest Little League 
Shirley Povisch Field- Founding Contributor-Bethesda, MD 
Greater Washington Board of Trade - Member, Committee Member 
Project 312 - I Have A Dream 
Board Member -Washington Nationals Youth Baseball Academy 
Board Member - First Tee of Washington, DC   
Executive Office of the Mayor -Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 211 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
Alan S. Bubes 
 
Alan S. Bubes is a native Washingtonian and is a graduate of the 
Sidwell Friends School. After graduating college, he worked with his 
family’s business here in DC and then with Aramark Corporation in 
Philadelphia.  In 1985, Mr. Bubes and his family purchased Linens of 
the Week, which was the former Arcade Sunshine/Palace Laundry, a 
Washington, DC institution, which was located on Lamont Street in 
Columbia Heights.                                   
 
Mr. Bubes served as President/CEO for over 30 years until the sale of 
the company in 2012. Linens of the Week grew into one of the largest 
linen supply companies in the country with numerous facilities 
throughout the East serving the restaurant and hospitality industry. Linens of the Week always 
remained true to its roots with its headquarters and laundry facility always remaining in the 
District. At its main plant and headquarters on Lamont Street, it employed 250 local associates 
and over 900 nationwide.  
 
Mr. Bubes and his family previously developed the Linens of the Week site into a multi-family 
condo/apartment development with over 200 units with construction that began in 2016.  Mr. 
Bubes has many other business interests and has been involved in, supports, and on the boards of 
many local philanthropic organizations. Among his many passions, his number one passion has 
always been Washington, DC sports. He and his family have been lifelong fans and season ticket 
holders of all of the major Washington sports teams. He still attends numerous sporting events 
for all of the teams every year.  
 
A Ward 3 resident, Mr. Bubes has a Bachelor of Science degree in Industrial Management from 
Georgia Institute of Technology in Atlanta, GA.   GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724 -7681 
 
To:   Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   December 12, 2023 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Alan Bubes and Brian 
Kenner as members and Leif Dormsjo as a member and chairperson of the 
Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  	If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202	-
724-1303, or me at 202-	724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 	Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish