Council | 03/01/2024 | Resolution R25-0413, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 002107 | ||
Council | 02/16/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0413 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/23/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0581 | ||
Council | 01/10/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 01/05/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/05/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0581 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/02/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/22/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |