District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0581 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/06/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-413  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 6, 2024 
 
 
To confirm the Mayoral reappointment of Ms. Marnique Heath to the Historic Preservation 
Review Board. 
 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Historic Preservation Review Board Marnique Heath 
Confirmation Resolution of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 
 
 Ms. Marnique Heath 
 Jocelyn Street, NW 
 Washington, DC 20015 
 (Ward 3) 
 
as an architect member of the Historic Preservation Review Board, established by Mayor’s Order 
83-119, dated May 6, 1983 (30 DCR 3031), pursuant to section 4 of the Historic Landmark and 
Historic District Protection Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-144; D.C. Official 
Code § 6-1103), to serve a term to end July 21, 2026. 
 
 Sec. 3. The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the 
nominee and the Office of the Mayor. 
 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.