District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0611 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+January 17, 2024
2+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
3+Chairman
4+Council
5+of the District of Columbia
6+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504
7+Washington, DC 20004-3003
8+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
9+District of Columbia Housing Authority
10+300 7th Street, SW I 10th Floor
11+Washington, DC 20024
12+[202) 535-1000 I dchousing.org
13+Executive Director, Keith Pettigrew
14+Pursuant to D.C. Official Code §2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration by the Council of the District of
15+Columbia, the (a) Council Contract Summary for the Agreement to Enter into a Long-Term Subsidy Contract
16+("ALTSC") between the District
17+of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") and Hope View Apartments LP
18+("Owner"), and (b) Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A Approval Resolution
19+of 2024.
20+DCHA proposes to provide a housing subsidy to the Owner in the initial amount
21+of $232,536 annually for a multi-year
22+term
23+of fifteen (15) years, in support of the District's Local Rent Supplement Program to provide affordable housing
24+units at Hope View Apartments located at 1337 Good Hope Road, SE.
25+As always,
26+I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the proposed AL TSC. In order to
27+facilitate a response to any questions concerning this AL TSC, please have your staff contact my Chief
28+of Staff, Alethea
29+McNair, at (202) 993-8190.
30+I look forward to your favorable consideration of this proposed ALTSC agreement.
31+Sincerely,
32+Keith Pettigrew
33+Executive Director, District
34+of Columbia Housing Authority
35+Enclosures
36+KP/hg
37+cc: Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council 1
38+2
39+3
40+4
41+5
42+6
43+7
44+8
45+9
46+10
47+11
48+12
49+13
50+14
51+15
52+16
53+17
54+18
55+19
56+20
57+21
58+22
59+23
60+24
61+25
62+26
63+27
64+28
65+29
66+30
67+31
68+32
69+33
70+34
71+35
72+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
73+~~
74+Chairman Phil Mendels on
75+at the request of District of
76+Columbia Housing Authority
77+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
78+To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the
79+District's Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with affordable
80+housing units for Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A with Hope View Apartments
81+LP for
82+program units at Hope View Apartments located at 1337 Good Hope Road, SE.
83+RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
84+resolution may be cited
85+as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A
86+with Hope View Apartments LP Approval Resolution
87+of 2024".
88+Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title II
89+of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support
90+Act
91+of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income
92+households in the District. The passage
93+of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program
94+("LRSP"), a program designed
95+to provide affordable housing and supportive services to
96+extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless or
97+in need of
98+supportive services, such as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based,
99+tenant-based, and sponsored-based LRSP affordable housing units. The BSA provided for the
100+District
101+of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") to administer the LRSP on behalf of the
102+District.
103+{0030893
104+-} 1
2105
3106
4107
108+{0030893 - }2
5109
6-1
7-
8-A RESOLUTION
9-
10-25-427
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-February 6, 2024
110+(b) In September of 2021 , the District of Columbia’s Department of Housing and 1
111+Community Development (“DHCD”), issued a Consolidated Request for Proposals for 2
112+Affordable Housing Projects (RFP”) regarding the availability of funds from multiple District 3
113+agencies, including D CHA, DHCD, the Department of Behavioral Health, the Department of 4
114+Human Services, and the District of Columbia Housing Finance Agency. Of the t hirty (30) total 5
115+proposals received, e leven (11) developers were chosen to work with DCHA and other District 6
116+agencies to develop affordable housing and permanent supportive housing units for extremely 7
117+low-income families making zero to t hirty percent (30%) of the area’s median income, as well as 8
118+the chronically homeless and individuals with mental or physical disabilities. Upon approval of 9
119+the contract by the Council, DCHA will enter into an a greement to enter into a l ong-term subsidy 10
120+contract (“ALTSC”) with the selected housing providers under the LRSP for housing services. 11
121+(c) There exists an immediate need to approve the l ong term subsidy contract with H ope 12
122+View Apartments LP under the LRSP in order to provide long- term affordable housing units for 13
123+extremely low-income households for u nits located at 1337 G ood Hope Road, SE. 14
124+ (d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an A LTSC between the District 15
125+of Columbia Housing Authority and Hope View Apartments LP with respect to the payment of a 16
126+rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Hope View Apartments and 17
127+house extremely low-income households with incomes at thirty percent (30%) or less of the area 18
128+median income. 19
129+ Sec. 3. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Ho me Rule Act, approved 20
130+December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.51), and section 202 of the 21
131+Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18- 371; D.C. 22
132+Official Code § 2- 352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with Hope View Apartments LP 23
15133
16134
17-To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the
18-District’s Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with
19-affordable housing units for Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A with Hope View Apartments
20-LP for program units at Hope View Apartments located at 1337 Good Hope Road, SE.
21135
22-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this
23-resolution may be cited as the “Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A
24-with Hope View Apartments LP Approval Resolution of 2024”.
136+{0030893 - }3
25137
26-Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
27-December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and section 202 of the
28-Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C.
29-Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves the long-term subsidy contract, Contract
30-No. 2024-LRSP-02A, with Hope View Apartments LP to provide an operating subsidy in
31-support 16 affordable housing units in an initial amount not to exceed $232,536 annually.
32-
33- Sec. 4. Transmittal.
34- The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of
35-Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.
36-
37- Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.
38-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal
39-impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
40-approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
41-
42-Sec. 6. Effective date.
43-This resolution shall take effect immediately.
138+to provide an operating subsidy in support sixteen (16) affordable housing units in an initial 1
139+amount not to exceed $ 232,536 annually. 2
140+ Sec. 4. Transmittal. 3
141+ The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of 4
142+Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor. 5
143+ Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 6
144+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 7
145+impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 8
146+approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 9
147+Sec. 6. Effective date. 10
148+This resolution shall take effect immediately. 11