District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0611 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/06/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-427  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 6, 2024 
 
 
To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the 
District’s Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with 
affordable housing units for Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A with Hope View Apartments 
LP for program units at Hope View Apartments located at 1337 Good Hope Road, SE.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A 
with Hope View Apartments LP Approval Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and section 202 of the 
Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves the long-term subsidy contract, Contract 
No. 2024-LRSP-02A, with Hope View Apartments LP to provide an operating subsidy in 
support 16 affordable housing units in an initial amount not to exceed $232,536 annually.  
 
 Sec. 4. Transmittal.  
 The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of 
Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.  
 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
Sec. 6. Effective date.  
This resolution shall take effect immediately.