Council | 04/12/2024 | Resolution R25-0474, Effective from Apr 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 004125 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0474 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/26/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 03/21/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0640 | ||
Council | 03/13/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/12/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/07/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0640 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/23/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/16/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |