Council | 04/02/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0467 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/28/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/22/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/18/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/08/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0659 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/27/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |