District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0665 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11   
22  
33 -*BE)BIK K K
44 ?>?B)*<-K $
55 8:<K ->,-<C?>K
66 8):B=)>K
77 ?E>+:<K ?
88 .K D8-K :CDB:+DK ? .K ?<E=*:)K
99 ?8>K  K (:<C?>K 
1010 E :<,:>7K
1111  K $->>CI<F)>:)K F->E-K "(K &E:D-K 
1212 K
1313 (
1414 )C8:>7D?>K K K
1515 
1616 -)BK 8):B=)>K ->,-<C?>K
1717 
1818 >+<?C-,K.?BK+?>C:,-B)D:?>K)>,K->)+D=->DK*IKD8-K?E>+:<K?.KD8-K:CDB:+DK?.K?<E=*:)K:CK@B?@?C-,K
1919 *:<<KD8-K“?>DB)+DK"? K(K(  KG:D8K +()B,K%-)<KCD)D-KK,*)K'8-K)=:<I
2020 
2121 )E>,B?=)DK@@B?F)<K)>,K$)I=->DKED8?B:J)D:?>K=-B7->+IK+DK?.K ”K)>,K)++?=@)>I:>7
2222 -
2323 =-B7->+IK,-+<)B)D:?>KB-C?<ED:?>
2424 '8-K<-7:C<)D:?>KG:<<K)@
2525 @B?F-KD8-K*)C-K@-B:?,K)>,K?@D:?>KI-)BK K?.K-=-B7->+IK?>DB)+DK"? K
2626 
2727 (  KG:D8K +()B,K%-)<KCD)D-KK,*)K'8-K)=:<IK)E>,B?=)DKD?K@B?F:,-K-=-B7->+IK
2828 <)E>,BIKC-BF:+-CK.?BK=:
2929 7B)>DK.)=:<:-CK)>,K:>,:F:,E)<CK)BB:F:>7K.B?=KD8-KB:J?>) -H:+?K)>,K
3030 '-H)C -H:+?K*?B,-BC KK
3131 >K),,:D:?>KD8-K<-7:C<)D:?>KG:<<K)@@B?F-K@)I=->DK.?BKC-BF:+-CKB-+-:F-,K
3232 )>,KD?K*-KB-+-:F-,KE>,-B
3333 KD8-K*)C-K@-B:?,K)>,K?@D:?>KI-)BK K?.KD8-K+?>DB)+D K
3434 .KI?EK8)F-K)>IKAE-CD:?
3535 >CKB-7)B,:>7KD8:CK<-7:C<)D:?>K@<-)C-K8)F-KI?EBKCD)..K+?>D)+DK )B+K&+?DDK
3636 
3737 8:-.K#@-B)D:>7K#..:+-BK#..:+-K?.K?>DB)+D:>7K)>,K$B?+EB-=->DK)DK K KK
3838 KEB7-KD8-K?E>+:<KD?KD);-K@B?=@DK)>,K.)F?B)*<-K)+D:?>K?>KD8-K->+<?C-,K<-7:C<)D:?> ~ ;:;Jt~~
3939 3 ?chairman PhilMendelson
4040 4 at the request
4141 of the Mayor
4242 5
4343 6
4444 7
4545 8 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
4646 9
4747 10
4848 11
4949 12 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
5050 13
5151 14
5252 15
5353 16
5454 17
5555 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract
5656 18 No. CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat,
5757 19 and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 thereto, to provide emergency laundry
5858 20 services for migrant families and individuals arriving from the Arizona-Mexico
5959 21 and Texas-Mexico borders, and to authorize payment for the goods and services
6060 22 received and
6161 to be received under the contract and modifications.
6262 23
6363 24 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That
6464 25 this resolution may be cited as the "Contract No. CW103312 with Mc Ward Real Estate,
6565 26 LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency
6666 27 Declaration Resolution
6767 of 2024".
6868 28 Sec. 2. (a) There exists a need to approve Contract No. CW103312 with Mc Ward
6969 29 Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5
7070 30 thereto,
7171 to provide emergency laundry services for migrant families and individuals
7272 31 arriving from the Arizona-Mexico and Texas-Mexico borders, and to authorize payment
7373 32 for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract and the
7474 33 modifications.
7575 34 (b) On November 1, 2022, the Office
7676 of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf
7777 35 of the Department of Human Services, awarded Contract No. CW103312 on an
7878 1 2
7979 emergency basis pursuant to the Migrant Services and Supports Emergency Act of 2022, 36
8080 with a base period of November 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023, i n the not-to-37
8181 exceed amount of $1,120 ,000. 38
8282 (c) By Modification No. 1, dated February 28, 20 23, the Office of Contracting 39
8383 and Procurement, on be half of the Department of Human Services, increased the base 40
8484 period not -to-exceed amount by $580,000 t o $1,700,000. 41
8585 (d) Modification No. 2 was an administrative modification. 42
8686 (e) By Modification No. 3, dated October 1, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 43
8787 Procurement, on be half of the Department of Human Services, exercised a part of option 44
8888 year 1 of Contract No. CW103312 f or the period October 1, 2023 t hrough February 14, 45
8989 2024, i n the not-to-exceed amount $542,875.33. 46
9090 (f) Modification No. 4 is now necessary to exercise t he remainder of option year 47
9191 1 for the period February 15, 2024 through S eptember 30, 2024 i n the not-to-exceed 48
9292 amount of $1,085,750.67, t hereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount for option 49
9393 year 1 to $1,628,626.00. 50
9494 (g) Modification No. 5 extended t he option period from February 14, 2024 to 51
9595 March 8, 2024 at no cost to the District. 52
9696 (h) Council approval is required by section 451(b) of the District of Columbia 53
9797 Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-54
9898 204.51(b)) since t he base period and the modifications are both in excess $1 million 55
9999 during separate 12- month periods . 56
100100 (i) Approval is necessary t o allow the continuation of these vital services. 57 3
101101 . Without this approval, McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat cannot 58
102102 be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 m illion for the contract period 59
103103 November 1, 2022 th rough S eptember 30, 2023, or the contract period October 1, 2023 60
104104 through September 30, 2024. 61
105105 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines th at the 62
106106 circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it 63
107107 necessary that the Contract No. CW10 3312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The 64
108108 Family Laundromat Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024 be 65
109109 adopted after a single reading. 66
110110 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 67