District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0665 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/28/2024

                            �������	���� ���
������
��-�*�B�E�)�B�I�K	����K	�����K
��?�>�?�B�)�*�<�-�K	�$
�8�:�<�K	� �-�>�,�-�<�C�?�>�K
��8�)�:�B�=�)�>�K
��?�E�>�+�:�<�K	�?
�.�K �D�8�-�K	��:�C�D�B�:�+�D�K	�?	�.�K ��?�<�E�=�*�:�)�K
��?�8�>�K	�� �K	�(�:�<�C�?�>�K	�
�E �:�<�,�:�>�7�K
�����K	�$�-�>�>�C�I�<�F�)�>�:�)�K	��F�-�>�E�-��K	�"�(��K	�&�E�:�D�-�K	�
���K
�(
�)�C�8�:�>�7�D�?�>��K	���K	�	� ����K
�
�-�)�B�K	��8�)�:�B�=�)�>�K	� �-�>�,�-�<�C�?�>��K
�
�>�+�<�?�C�-�,�K�.�?�B�K�+�?�>�C�:�,�-�B�)�D�:�?�>�K�)�>�,�K�-�>�)�+�D�=�-�>�D�K�*�I�K�D�8�-�K��?�E�>�+�:�<�K�?�.�K�D�8�-�K��:�C�D�B�:�+�D�K�?�.�K��?�<�E�=�*�:�)�K�:�C�K�@�B�?�@�?�C�-�,�K
�*�:�<�<��K�D�8�-�K“��?�>�D�B�)�+�D�K�"�?� �K��(�K��(�������K�G�:�D�8�K� �+�(�)�B�,�K�%�-�)�<�K��C�D�)�D�-��K����K�,��*��)�K�'�8�-�K��)�=�:�<�I
�
�)�E�>�,�B�?�=�)�D�K��@�@�B�?�F�)�<�K�)�>�,�K�$�)�I�=�-�>�D�K��E�D�8�?�B�:�J�)�D�:�?�>�K��=�-�B�7�-�>�+�I�K��+�D�K�?�.�K�����”�K�)�>�,�K�)�+�+�?�=�@�)�>�I�:�>�7
�-
�=�-�B�7�-�>�+�I�K�,�-�+�<�)�B�)�D�:�?�>�K�B�-�C�?�<�E�D�:�?�>� 
�'�8�-�K�<�-�7�:�C�<�)�D�:�?�>�K�G�:�<�<�K�)�@
�@�B�?�F�-�K�D�8�-�K�*�)�C�-�K�@�-�B�:�?�,�K�)�>�,�K�?�@�D�:�?�>�K�I�-�)�B�K��K�?�.�K�-�=�-�B�7�-�>�+�I�K��?�>�D�B�)�+�D�K�"�?� �K
�
�(�������K�G�:�D�8�K� �+�(�)�B�,�K�%�-�)�<�K��C�D�)�D�-��K����K�,��*��)�K�'�8�-�K��)�=�:�<�I�K��)�E�>�,�B�?�=�)�D�K�D�?�K�@�B�?�F�:�,�-�K�-�=�-�B�7�-�>�+�I�K
�<�)�E�>�,�B�I�K�C�-�B�F�:�+�-�C�K�.�?�B�K�=�:
�7�B�)�>�D�K�.�)�=�:�<�:�-�C�K�)�>�,�K�:�>�,�:�F�:�,�E�)�<�C�K�)�B�B�:�F�:�>�7�K�.�B�?�=�K�D�8�-�K��B�:�J�?�>�)�� �-�H�:�+�?�K�)�>�,�K
�'�-�H�)�C�� �-�H�:�+�?�K�*�?�B�,�-�B�C� �K�K
��>�K�)�,�,�:�D�:�?�>��K�D�8�-�K�<�-�7�:�C�<�)�D�:�?�>�K�G�:�<�<�K�)�@�@�B�?�F�-�K�@�)�I�=�-�>�D�K�.�?�B�K�C�-�B�F�:�+�-�C�K�B�-�+�-�:�F�-�,�K
�)�>�,�K�D�?�K�*�-�K�B�-�+�-�:�F�-�,�K�E�>�,�-�B
�K�D�8�-�K�*�)�C�-�K�@�-�B�:�?�,�K�)�>�,�K�?�@�D�:�?�>�K�I�-�)�B�K��K�?�.�K�D�8�-�K�+�?�>�D�B�)�+�D� �K
��.�K�I�?�E�K�8�)�F�-�K�)�>�I�K�A�E�-�C�D�:�?
�>�C�K�B�-�7�)�B�,�:�>�7�K�D�8�:�C�K�<�-�7�:�C�<�)�D�:�?�>��K�@�<�-�)�C�-�K�8�)�F�-�K�I�?�E�B�K�C�D�)�.�.�K�+�?�>�D�)�+�D�K� �)�B�+�K�&�+�?�D�D��K
�
�8�:�-�.�K�#�@�-�B�)�D�:�>�7�K�#�.�.�:�+�-�B��K�#�.�.�:�+�-�K�?�.�K��?�>�D�B�)�+�D�:�>�7�K�)�>�,�K�$�B�?�+�E�B�-�=�-�>�D��K�)�D�K������K��������� �K�K
��K�E�B�7�-�K�D�8�-�K��?�E�>�+�:�<�K�D�?�K�D�)�;�-�K�@�B�?�=�@�D�K�)�>�,�K�.�)�F�?�B�)�*�<�-�K�)�+�D�:�?�>�K�?�>�K�D�8�-�K�-�>�+�<�?�C�-�,�K�<�-�7�:�C�<�)�D�:�?�>�  ~ ;:;Jt~~ 
3 	?chairman PhilMendelson 
4 	at the request 
of the Mayor 
5 
6 
7 
8 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
9 
10 
11 
12 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect 	to the need to approve Contract 
18 No. CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat, 
19 and Modification Nos. 	1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 thereto, to provide emergency laundry 
20 services for migrant families and individuals arriving from the Arizona-Mexico 
21 and Texas-Mexico borders, and to authorize payment for the goods and services 
22 received and 
to be received under the contract and modifications. 
23 
24 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 
25 this resolution may be cited 	as the "Contract No. CW103312 with 	Mc Ward Real Estate, 
26 LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency 
27 Declaration Resolution 
of 2024". 
28 Sec. 2. (a) There exists a need to approve Contract No. CW103312 with Mc Ward 
29 Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 
30 thereto, 
to provide emergency laundry services for migrant families and individuals 
31 arriving from the Arizona-Mexico and Texas-Mexico borders, and 	to authorize payment 
32 for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract and the 
33 modifications. 
34 (b) On November 1, 2022, the Office 
of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf 
35 of the Department of Human Services, awarded Contract No. CW103312 on an 
1   	2 
emergency basis pursuant to the Migrant Services and Supports Emergency Act of 2022, 36 
with a base period of November 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023, i n the not-to-37 
exceed amount of $1,120 ,000.    38 
(c)  By Modification No. 1, dated February 28, 20 23, the Office of Contracting 39 
and Procurement, on be half of the Department of Human Services, increased the base 40 
period not -to-exceed amount by $580,000 t o $1,700,000.  41 
(d)  Modification No. 2 was an administrative modification.  42 
(e)  By Modification No. 3, dated October 1, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 43 
Procurement, on be half of the Department of Human Services, exercised a part of option 44 
year 1 of Contract No. CW103312 f or the period October 1, 2023 t hrough February 14, 45 
2024, i n the not-to-exceed amount $542,875.33. 46 
(f)  Modification No. 4 is now necessary to exercise t he remainder of option year 47 
1 for the period February 15, 2024 through S	eptember 30, 2024 i n the not-to-exceed 48 
amount of $1,085,750.67, t hereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount for option 49 
year 1 to $1,628,626.00. 50 
(g) Modification No. 5 extended t	he option period from February 14, 2024 to 51 
March 8, 2024 at no cost to the District. 52 
(h)  Council approval is required by section 451(b) of the District of Columbia 53 
Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-54 
204.51(b)) since t he base period and the modifications are both in excess $1 million 55 
during separate 12-	month periods .  56 
  (i)  Approval is necessary t o allow the continuation of these vital services. 57   	3 
.  Without this approval, McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat cannot 58 
be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 m	illion for the contract period 59 
November 1, 2022 th rough S eptember 30, 2023, or the contract period October 1, 2023 60 
through September 30, 2024. 61 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines th	at the 62 
circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency 	circumstances making it 63 
necessary that the Contract No. CW10	3312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The 64 
Family Laundromat Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024 be 65 
adopted after a single reading. 66 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 67