1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | 1 |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-476 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | April 2, 2024 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No. |
---|
17 | | - | CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat, and |
---|
18 | | - | Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6 thereto, to provide emergency laundry services for |
---|
19 | | - | migrant families and individuals arriving from the Arizona-Mexico and Texas-Mexico |
---|
20 | | - | borders, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received |
---|
21 | | - | under the contract and modifications. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
24 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a |
---|
25 | | - | The Family Laundromat Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration |
---|
26 | | - | Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
27 | | - | |
---|
28 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. CW103312 with |
---|
29 | | - | McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, |
---|
30 | | - | and 6 thereto, to provide emergency laundry services for migrant families and individuals |
---|
31 | | - | arriving from the Arizona-Mexico and Texas-Mexico borders and to authorize payment for the |
---|
32 | | - | goods and services received and to be received under the contract and the modifications. |
---|
33 | | - | (b) On November 1, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf of the |
---|
34 | | - | Department of Human Services, awarded Contract No. CW103312 on an emergency basis |
---|
35 | | - | pursuant to the Migrant Services and Supports Emergency Act of 2022, with a base period of |
---|
36 | | - | November 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of $1,120,000. |
---|
37 | | - | (c) By Modification No. 1, dated February 28, 2023, the Office of Contracting and |
---|
38 | | - | Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Human Services, increased the base period not-to- |
---|
39 | | - | exceed amount by $580,000 to $1,700,000. |
---|
40 | | - | (d) Modification No. 2 was an administrative modification. |
---|
41 | | - | (e) By Modification No. 3, dated October 1, 2023, the Office of Contracting and |
---|
42 | | - | Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Human Services, exercised a part of option year 1 |
---|
43 | | - | of Contract No. CW103312 for the period October 1, 2023 through February 14, 2024, in the |
---|
44 | | - | not-to-exceed amount $542,875.33. |
---|
45 | | - | (f) Modification No. 4 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option year 1 for the |
---|
46 | | - | period February 15, 2024 through September 30, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount of ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
| 1 | + | |
---|