District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0697 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/02/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-476  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
April 2, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No. 
CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat, and 
Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6 thereto, to provide emergency laundry services for 
migrant families and individuals arriving from the Arizona-Mexico and Texas-Mexico 
borders, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received 
under the contract and modifications.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a 
The Family Laundromat Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration 
Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. CW103312 with 
McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 
and 6 thereto, to provide emergency laundry services for migrant families and individuals 
arriving from the Arizona-Mexico and Texas-Mexico borders and to authorize payment for the 
goods and services received and to be received under the contract and the modifications. 
(b) On November 1, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf of the 
Department of Human Services, awarded Contract No. CW103312 on an emergency basis 
pursuant to the Migrant Services and Supports Emergency Act of 2022, with a base period of 
November 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of $1,120,000.    
(c) By Modification No. 1, dated February 28, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Human Services, increased the base period not-to-
exceed amount by $580,000 to $1,700,000.  
(d) Modification No. 2 was an administrative modification.  
(e) By Modification No. 3, dated October 1, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Human Services, exercised a part of option year 1 
of Contract No. CW103312 for the period October 1, 2023 through February 14, 2024, in the 
not-to-exceed amount $542,875.33. 
(f) Modification No. 4 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option year 1 for the 
period February 15, 2024 through September 30, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount of    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
$1,085,750.67, thereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount for option year 1 to 
$1,628,626.00. 
(g) Modification No. 5 extended the option period from February 14, 2024 to March 8, 
2024, at no cost to the District. 
(h) Modification No. 6 extended the option period from March 8, 2024 to April 15, 2024, 
at no cost to the District. 
(i) Council approval is required by section 451(b) of the Home Rule Act (D.C. Official 
Code § 1-204.51(b)) as the base period and the modifications are both in excess of $1 million 
during separate 12-month periods.   
  (j) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. Without this 
approval, McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat cannot be paid for goods and 
services provided in excess of $1 million for the contract period November 1, 2022 through 
September 30, 2023, or the contract period October 1, 2023 through September 30, 2024. 
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Contract No. CW103312 with McWard 
Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family Laundromat Approval and Payment Authorization 
Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.