Council | 06/11/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0504 | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 05/23/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 05/10/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/02/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/05/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0712 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 03/28/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |