Council | 07/26/2024 | Resolution R25-0567, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 009368 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0567 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/03/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 07/02/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0749 | ||
Council | 07/01/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 05/10/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0749 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Council | 05/02/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |