Council | 07/26/2024 | Resolution R25-0562, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 009363 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0562 | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 06/20/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0772 | ||
Council | 06/13/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/07/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 05/31/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/24/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/10/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0772 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 05/03/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |