Council | 07/26/2024 | Resolution R25-0585, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 009376 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0585 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 07/03/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 07/02/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0798 | ||
Council | 07/01/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 06/27/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/26/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/18/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/21/2024 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Council | 05/17/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0798 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/09/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |