District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0842 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/11/2024

                              ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-526  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 11, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend Chapter 3 of Title 13 
of the District of Columbia Official Code to provide that publication may be substituted 
for personal service of process for appointments of a vulnerable youth guardian in certain 
circumstances; and to amend Chapter 23 of Title 16 of the District of Columbia Official 
Code to authorize the Family Division of the Superior Court to appoint, modify, and 
terminate a new class of legal guardianship for vulnerable youth.   
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2 (a) Special Immigrant Juvenile Status (“SIJS”) is a special humanitarian visa 
established by the federal government covering abused, neglected, or abandoned immigrant 
youth under age 21. If approved, those granted SIJS are authorized to work, maintain a Social 
Security Number, receive assistance for housing and education, and eventually apply for lawful 
permanent residency, making SIJS an important legal lifeline for vulnerable immigrant youth, 
especially undocumented immigrant youth. 
(b) Under 8 U.S.C. § 1101(a)(27)(J), to apply for a SIJS visa, an applicant must be an 
unmarried noncitizen under 21 years of age, be presently residing in the United States, and 
possess a juvenile court order from a state court. The court order must find that: 
(1) The petitioner is dependent on the court or under custody of a state agency, 
department, or court-appointed guardian;  
(2) The petitioner has suffered from abuse, neglect, abandonment, or other related 
reason that makes reunification with the petitioner’s parents impossible; and  
(3) It is in the best interest of the petitioner not to return to the previous country of 
nationality or the country of the last habitual residence of the petitioner or of the petitioner’s 
parents.     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
(c) Despite the intended reach of this humanitarian visa, a number of eligible immigrant 
youth in the District may be unable to access these critical protections due to an inconsistency 
between District law and federal law. Under current District law, the Superior Court of the 
District of Columbia lacks authority over unmarried noncitizens who are at least 18 but younger 
than 21 that would be consistent with federal SIJS petition requirements. Specifically, the court 
does not have authority over these youth except in certain extremely limited circumstances, such 
as the youth being under the care of the Child and Family Service Agency or being legally found 
to have been subjected to neglect.  
(d) Because the court’s authority over unmarried noncitizens who are at least age 18 but 
younger than 21 is limited, the court has no legal mechanism to issue the orders necessary to 
allow a number of eligible youth to apply for SIJS, even though federally SIJS petitioners are 
allowed to petition until the age of 21. The court also lacks the necessary authority to appoint 
guardians to unmarried noncitizens who are at least age 18 but younger than 21, which can be a 
necessary component of the SIJS petition. This lack of authority prevents many immigrant youth 
in the District (and in particular undocumented immigrant youth) who have suffered from abuse, 
abandonment, or neglect from obtaining relief from that past mistreatment by accessing these 
critical federal protections as intended.  
(e) There is a pressing need to address the lack of access to federal protections and lack 
of accessible guardianship appointments for immigrant youth, one of the District’s most 
vulnerable populations. Child welfare organizations, advocacy groups, and experts testified at the 
Committee on the Judiciary and Public Safety’s June 8, 2023, hearing on the Vulnerable Youth 
Guardianship Protection Amendment Act of 2023, as introduced on January 19, 2023 (Bill 25-
44) (“permanent bill”), that immigrant youth without the critical supports of guardianship are 
especially vulnerable to abuses such as human trafficking and housing insecurity. SIJS visas 
allow for the material benefits of access to employment, the procurement of a Social Security 
number, healthcare, assistance with housing and education, and eventually the possibility of 
applying for lawful permanent residency. The stability and safety that SIJS affords immigrant 
youth also fosters their emotional, psychological, and physical well-being by providing them 
with a stable and supportive schooling environment, community, and household. With the 
protections of a court appointed guardian, youth will not be forced to move from their friends 
and communities to other jurisdictions to try to access SIJS protections. SIJS thus importantly 
shields immigrant youth from emotional and psychological suffering, exploitation and abuse, 
involvement in illegal activity, material instability, and housing insecurity. Advocates testified 
that they must turn away several youths on a monthly basis because of this ongoing 
misalignment in District and federal law and that even eligible youth close to the cutoff age of 18 
find it difficult to obtain a pro bono attorney with the expertise to rapidly prepare and file the 
necessary legal documents.    ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
(f) It is estimated that more than one third of unaccompanied immigrant youth coming to 
the United States have already reached 17 years of age, meaning that when these youth arrive in 
the District they are already on the verge of aging out of Superior Court authority should they 
wish to seek federal relief under SIJS while residing in the District. This misalignment between 
the District and federal law means that, absent Council action, a class of vulnerable District 
immigrant youth will be unable to seek legal relief afforded to them by federal law and will be 
unable to seek the care and support of a guardianship appointment while living in the District. 
(g) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship 
Protection Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, effective November 28, 2023 (D.C. Law 25-91; 
70 DCR 13754) (“temporary law”), which will expire on July 10, 2024. The permanent version 
of the temporary law is currently undergoing congressional review. This emergency legislation is 
necessary to fill the gap between the expiration of the temporary law and the effective date of the 
permanent act.  
(h) This emergency bill mirrors the permanent version of the bill in incorporating minor 
technical changes and one substantive change not included in the expiring temporary law, 
namely the elimination of fees for filing guardianship petitions. 
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship 
Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.