Council | 10/18/2024 | Resolution R25-0652, Effective from Oct 01, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 012539 | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0652 | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/25/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/25/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0856 | ||
Council | 09/24/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 09/24/2024 | Roundtable Hearing | ||
Council | 09/23/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 09/23/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/21/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0856 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/18/2024 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |